Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:D P Marshall Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-00892
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Terminated:Nov 02, 2023
Defendant
Cindy Gilmer
Defendant
Daniel Shone
Defendant
DeLay Gunner
Plaintiff
Judrika Houston

GPO Nov 02 2023
ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer the entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/2023. (ldb)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, November 02, 2023
5 5 misc Transfer Case Email Thu 11/02 2:37 PM
E-MAIL received from Western District of Arkansas confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 2:23-cv-02132. (kbc)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/02 1:37 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to immediately transfer the entire case file to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Note Thu 11/02 1:39 PM
Docket Note: Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas on this date. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
3 3 1 pgs motion Order Wed 11/01 10:54 AM
MOTION for Status by Judrika Houston. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 09/27 11:50 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Judrika Houston.(kdr)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/27 11:47 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Judrika Houston. (kdr)
Related: [-]