Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Edie R Ervin
Referred: Edie R Ervin
Case #: 4:23-cv-00893
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2023
Defendant
Dexter Payne
Defendant
Gary Smith
Defendant
Hammock
Defendant
Michael Richardson
Defendant
Moses Jackson
Defendant
Moses Jackson III
Defendant
Natasha Hammock
Defendant
Owen
Defendant
Richardson
Defendant
Smith
Defendant
Timothy Owen
Defendant
William F Straughn
Plaintiff
Cornelius Spencer

GPO Sep 29 2023
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying 1 motion for leave to proceed IFP; directing the Clerk to mail plaintiff a copy of this Order and a new IFP application; plaintiff must return the completed IFP application or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/29/2023. (jak)
GPO Jan 23 2024
ORDER denying 46 Mr. Spencer's motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 01/23/2024. (llg)
GPO Apr 09 2024
ORDER instructing the Clerk to update the docket sheet to reflect the full names of Defendants Owen, Hammock, and Smith - Timothy Owen, Natasha Hammock, and Gary Smith. Doc. 32; denying 39 Medical Defendants' motion for summary judgment; allowing Mr. Spencer to proceed on his clams against the Medical Defendants raised in grievance EAM-23-1022; granting in part and denying in part 63 ADC Defendants' motion for summary judgment; and allowing Mr. Spencer to proceed on his claims against the ADC Defendants regarding (1) his continued housing in solitary confinement raised against Defendants Jackson and Richardson raised in grievances EAM-22-2466 and EAM- 23-1022 and (2) his denial of yard call or outdoor recreation raised in grievance EAM-20-902. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 04/09/2024. (llg)
GPO Aug 12 2024
ORDER giving Mr. Spencer until and including 09/06/2024 to file a response to the Medical Defendants' motion for summary judgment and a separate statement of disputed facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 08/12/2024. (llg)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
157 157 misc Mail Returned Tue 03/18 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re152 Mail Returned. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of file mark and signature). The correct document was added to docket entry152 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
Related: [-]