Original Case: 1:20-cv-01170

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02752
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2023
Terminated:Aug 22, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2024 8:02 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
AGROFRESH INC
Represented By
Chad S.C. Stover
Barnes & Thornburg
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MIRTECH INC
Represented By
Glenn A. Brown
Real World Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DR. NAZIR MIR
Represented By
Glenn A. Brown
Real World Law
contact info

GPO Aug 22 2024
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: KRAUSE, RESTREPO and MATEY, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 11. Judge: RESTREPO Authoring. We will dismiss the appeal for lack of appellate jurisdiction.

Docket last updated: 08/23/2024 8:02 AM EDT
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (DW)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Nazir Mir and MirTech Inc in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01170. (DW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 2 pgs District_Court _Memorandum_Order_071123
Att: 3 2 pgs District Court Order_082523
Att: 4 17 pgs District Court Memorandum_092121
Att: 5 1 pgs District Court Order_092121
Att: 6 1 pgs Case_Caption
Att: 7 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (DW)
Related: [-]
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. All parties must file written responses addressing this issue, with a certificate of service attached, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (SEND TO MERITS)--[Edited 11/29/2023 by DW] (DW)
Related: [-]