Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Billy Roy Wilson
Case #: 4:23-cv-00899
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Re-opened:Oct 23, 2023
Terminated:Mar 12, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 3:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Modern Marketing and Commerce
Represented By
Robert A. Cox
Glassman, Wyatt, Tuttle & Cox, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stan Ricky Mitchell
1300 South Church Street Number E13
Jonesboro, AR 72401
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Daniel Babcock
Terminated: 10/23/2023
Defendant
Becky Bendert
Terminated: 10/23/2023
Defendant
Norge Luis
Terminated: 10/23/2023
Defendant
Stephinie Reeve
Terminated: 10/23/2023

GPO Oct 03 2023
ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice; and finding as moot 1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff, in fact, filed a charge with the EEOC he may file a motion to reopen and include a copy of the charge and the notice of rights to sue letter. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/03/2023. (llg) (VACATED on 10/23/2023 pursuant to 7 Order.) (cmn)
GPO Feb 07 2024
LETTER ORDER informing Mr. Mitchell of the deadline to file a response to 11 Motion to Dismiss is by 5:00 p.m. on 2/15/2024. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/7/2024. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
18 18 order Judgment Tue 03/12 2:46 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with today's17 Order, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/12/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
17 17 6 pgs order Order Tue 03/12 2:42 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Dismiss; and dismissing Plaintiff's claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/12/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
16 16 respm Response to Motion Tue 02/13 12:27 PM
RESPONSE to11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Stan Ricky Mitchell. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/07 12:05 PM
LETTER ORDER informing Mr. Mitchell of the deadline to file a response to11 Motion to Dismiss is by 5:00 p.m. on 2/15/2024. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/7/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
14 14 order Initial Scheduling Order Tue 01/16 10:59 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/25/2024. Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/8/2024. Jury Trial set for 1/21/2025 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/16/24. (mmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/12 3:15 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Modern Marketing and Commerce.(Cox, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 14 pgs misc Memorandum Fri 01/12 3:14 PM
MEMORANDUM re11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Modern Marketing and Commerce.(Cox, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Division of Corporations
11 11 motion Dismiss More Definite Statement Fri 01/12 3:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement () by Modern Marketing and Commerce (Cox, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/12 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Cox on behalf of Modern Marketing and Commerce (Cox, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/10 2:45 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Stan Ricky Mitchell. (wbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/26 4:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Modern Marketing and Commerce served on 12/22/2023. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Reopening Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/23 12:13 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to Reopen; directing the Clerk of the Court to reopen this case; vacating3 Order; granting1 Motion to Proceed IFP; dismissing without prejudice Babcock, Reeve, Bendert, and Luis; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant Modern Marketing and Commerce; and directing the Clerk to deliver the summons,2 Complaint, the4 ,5 Notices, and this Order, to the United States Marshal. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/23/2023. (jbh) (Docket text modified on 10/23/2023 to correct description.)(cmn)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Mon 10/23 12:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Modern Marketing and Commerce and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Mon 10/23 1:46 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re7 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include, "dismissing without prejudice Babcock, Reeve, Bendert, and Luis" as indicated by the Order.(cmn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/12 11:03 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Stan Ricky Mitchell. (wbb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/11 10:34 AM
NOTICE to the Court by Stan Ricky Mitchell. (wbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
4 4 motion Reopen Case Tue 10/10 1:40 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Stan Ricky Mitchell. (wbb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/03 4:00 PM
ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice; and finding as moot1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff, in fact, filed a charge with the EEOC he may file a motion to reopen and include a copy of the charge and the notice of rights to sue letter. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/03/2023. (llg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Thu 09/28 1:48 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Stan Ricky Mitchell. (jak)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 09/28 1:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stan Ricky Mitchell. (jak)
Related: [-]