Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Lee P Rudofsky
Referred: Patricia S Harris
Case #: 2:23-cv-00202
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 26, 2023
Terminated:Dec 07, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, December 07, 2023
6 6 appeal Appellate Filing Fee Notice Thu 12/07 12:33 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jbh)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Judgment 1983 Thu 12/07 12:28 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the4 Order that was entered today and prior Orders in this case, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment or any related Orders would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/7/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/07 12:24 PM
ORDER dismissing Mr. Davis's Complaint without prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order or the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/7/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
3 3 4 pgs order Order Fri 09/29 11:48 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS directing the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days; directing plaintiff to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying certificate and calculation sheet, or pay the $402 filing and administrative fees within 30 days of the date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff a blank complaint form and IFP application along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 9/29/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
2 2 2 pgs order Order Thu 09/28 5:29 PM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/28 5:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Does, filed by James Edward Carlos Davis.(kdr)
Related: [-]