Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Case #: 2:23-cv-00203
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:California Central, 2:23-cv-02141
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 4:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Rachel Elizabeth Hobbs
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Joseph Cotten Cunningham
Barber Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Mary Katherine Planchet
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Matthew Steven Jones
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Galib Mirza
Represented By
Adam Feit
Mardirossian Akaragian LLP
contact info
Sedrak Yenikomshuyan
Mardirossian Akaragian LLP
contact info
Armen Kevork Akaragian
Mardirossian Akaragian LLP
contact info
George Jawlakian
Jawlakian Law Group Apc
contact info
Robert L. Beard, Jr.
Rainwater, Holt & Sexton P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
59 59 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 02/12 12:07 PM
ORDER adopting58 joint stipulation of dismissal; and dismissing with prejudice the action, with each party to bear its own costs, attorneys' fees, and expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/12/2025. (jbh)
Related: [-]