Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Referred: Edie R Ervin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00198
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Tyler Jumper

GPO Oct 04 2023
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to mail plaintiff a new IFP application along with a copy of this Order; and directing plaintiff to return a completed IFP application or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/4/2023. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 04, 2024
4 4 misc Mail Returned Mon 03/04 1:01 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Tyler Jumper re3 Recommended Disposition.(fjg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
3 3 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 11/07 3:12 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending1 Mr. Jumper's complaint be dismissed, without prejudice; and the Clerk be instructed to close the case. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 11/07/2023. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
2 2 3 pgs order Order Wed 10/04 12:06 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk to mail plaintiff a new IFP application along with a copy of this Order; and directing plaintiff to return a completed IFP application or pay the $402.00 filing fee within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/4/2023. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Does, filed by Tyler Jumper.(kdr)
Related: [-]