Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Case #: 3:23-cv-00199
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 4:52 AM CDT
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
SMS Group GmbH
Defendant
SMS Group Inc
Represented By
Joseph Cotten Cunningham
Barber Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Defendant
SMS Siemag AG Germany
Defendant
SMS USA LLC
Represented By
Joseph Cotten Cunningham
Barber Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandon Smith
Represented By
Floyd A. Healy
Attorney At Law
contact info
Robert B. Buckalew
Attorney At Law
contact info

GPO Oct 15 2024
ORDER granting 15 joint motion to extend the scheduling order deadlines; removing this case from the 11/25/2024 trial calendar and suspending all unexpired pretrial deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/2024. (jak)
GPO Apr 16 2025
ORDER granting 19 motion; ordering separate defendants SMS Group GmbH and SMS Siemag AG, Germany to produce their responses to Mr. Smith's first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents within 10 days of the date of this Order. After Mr. Smith's receipt of the responses, any party may file a motion seeking an extension of the discovery deadline, if necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/16/2025. (jak)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 05/05 10:11 AM
ORDER granting22 joint motion; and referring this matter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris to schedule and conduct a settlement conference between the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/5/2025. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
22 22 2 pgs motion Order Thu 05/01 11:17 AM
MOTION for Order by Brandon Smith (Healy, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/16 11:18 AM
ORDER granting19 motion; ordering separate defendants SMS Group GmbH and SMS Siemag AG, Germany to produce their responses to Mr. Smith's first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents within 10 days of the date of this Order. After Mr. Smith's receipt of the responses, any party may file a motion seeking an extension of the discovery deadline, if necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/16/2025. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
20 20 misc Status Report Thu 04/10 2:17 PM
STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by SMS Group GmbH, SMS Group Inc, SMS Siemag AG Germany, SMS USA LLC. (Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
19 19 motion Compel Wed 03/05 1:49 PM
MOTION to Compel by Brandon Smith(Healy, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
utility Notice of Docket Correction Tue 02/18 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re18 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party served as SMS Group GmbH as marked on the document. (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Mon 02/17 10:08 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Brandon Smith. Brandon Smith served on 4/5/2024. (Healy, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/16 3:13 PM
AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 6/9/2025 at 09:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 3/26/2025; Motions due by 4/10/2025; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/20/2025; Status Report due by 4/10/2025. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/16/2024. (tmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 10/15 4:57 PM
ORDER granting15 joint motion to extend the scheduling order deadlines; removing this case from the 11/25/2024 trial calendar and suspending all unexpired pretrial deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/15/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 09/25 2:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Brandon Smith (Healy, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/24 2:49 PM
NOTICE by SMS Group GmbH, SMS Siemag AG Germany NOTICE OF ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTION (Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 04/24 5:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SMS Siemag AG Germany (Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 04/24 4:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SMS Group GmbH (Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/24 4:42 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SMS Group GmbH, SMS Siemag AG Germany.(Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 14, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/14 4:31 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker. Discovery due by 9/11/2024; Motions due by 9/26/2024; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/5/2024; Status Report due by 9/26/2024. Signed at the direction of the Court on 03/14/2024. (tmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
9 9 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 02/26 10:34 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by SMS Group Inc, SMS USA LLC. (Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 01/31 5:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SMS Group Inc (Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 01/31 5:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by SMS USA LLC (Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
6 6 misc Deficiency Letter Tue 01/30 4:05 PM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re3 Answer notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Status Report Tue 01/30 1:45 PM
STATUS REPORT by Brandon Smith. (Healy, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
4 4 order Initial Scheduling Order Wed 12/13 3:07 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/12/2024; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/26/2024; Jury Trial set for for sometime during the week of 11/25/2024 at 09:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/13/2023. (tmw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/24 4:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SMS Group Inc, SMS USA LLC.(Cunningham, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
2 2 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/09 11:08 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Brandon Smith. (Healy, Floyd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Brandon Smith. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT3727.) (ajj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet