Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Case #: 4:23-cv-00904
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 4:53 AM CDT
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East LP
Represented By
E. B. Chiles, IV
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Glenn V. Larkin
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Walmart Inc
Represented By
E. B. Chiles, IV
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Glenn V. Larkin
Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Janene Sanders
Represented By
Austin Porter, Jr.
Porter Law Firm
contact info

GPO Jun 27 2024
ORDER denying 2 Defendant's motion to dismiss as to Plaintiff's 1981 failure to promote claims based on the statute of limitations; and granting Plaintiff 30 days leave from the date of this Order to amend her Complaint to provide sufficient facts in support of her claims. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 06/27/2024. (llg)
GPO Oct 30 2024
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Defendant's motion to dismiss; granting the motion as to Plaintiff's failure to promote claims with the exception of the Human Resources Manager position which Plaintiff applied for on 02/02/2019, and the OPS Manager positions which Plaintiff applied for on 09/02/2020 and 01/28/2023; and denying the motion as to Plaintiff's claims for retaliation and hostile work environment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/30/2024. (llg)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
29 29 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/26 10:34 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 2/23/2026 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Discovery due by 11/6/2025; Motions due by 11/21/2025; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 2/2/2026; Status Report due by 1/2/2026. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 3/26/2025. (kog)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
28 28 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 02/24 3:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc. Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Larkin, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
27 27 order Initial Scheduling Order Tue 01/21 1:55 PM
AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 2/10/2025; Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/24/2025. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 1/20/2026 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 1/21/2025.(kog)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/02 12:55 PM
ANSWER to13 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc.(Larkin, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/12 11:40 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/12/2024. (sjh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/11 4:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re13 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Larkin, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
23 23 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 10/30 1:18 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part14 Defendant's motion to dismiss; granting the motion as to Plaintiff's failure to promote claims with the exception of the Human Resources Manager position which Plaintiff applied for on 02/02/2019, and the OPS Manager positions which Plaintiff applied for on 09/02/2020 and 01/28/2023; and denying the motion as to Plaintiff's claims for retaliation and hostile work environment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/30/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 09/04 11:11 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting21 Motion to Stay deadlines until the motion to dismiss is decided. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/4/2024. (sjh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
21 21 motion Stay Tue 09/03 4:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Stay by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Larkin, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/13 9:08 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc. (Larkin, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
19 19 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 08/12 4:00 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/2024. (sjh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
18 18 motion Leave to File Document Thu 08/08 4:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to Reply in Support of Dismissal by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc(Chiles, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Monday, August 05, 2024
17 17 brief Brief in Support Mon 08/05 7:58 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re15 Brief in Support Plaintiff's Brief In Support In Opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Brief In Support for Relief From the Previous Order filed by Janene Sanders. (Porter, Austin)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 08/05 7:55 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Response to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Janene Sanders. (Porter, Austin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
15 15 brief Brief in Support Fri 08/02 2:56 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc. (Filed as a separate document by the Clerk's office pursuant to instruction from the attorney filer) (jak)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/02 10:50 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by All Defendants. (Larkin, Glenn) (Docket text modified on 8/2/2024 to remove reference to the brief in support filed as an attachment in error) (jak)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Fri 08/02 2:58 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re14 Motion To Dismiss. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the brief in support was filed as an attachment in error. The Clerk's office filed the Brief in Support as a separate document at entry15 pursuant to instruction from the filing attorney. (jak)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 20, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 07/20 4:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Janene Sanders(Porter, Austin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
12 12 order Initial Scheduling Order Tue 07/16 1:39 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 9/5/2024; Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/19/2024. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 6/23/2025 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/16/2024.(kog)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order
Thursday, June 27, 2024
11 11 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 06/27 4:46 PM
ORDER denying2 Defendant's motion to dismiss as to Plaintiff's 1981 failure to promote claims based on the statute of limitations; and granting Plaintiff 30 days leave from the date of this Order to amend her Complaint to provide sufficient facts in support of her claims. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 06/27/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 01/11 12:38 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re2 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc. (Chiles, E.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 01/09 12:49 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/9/2024. (sjh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
8 8 motion Leave to File Document Thu 01/04 11:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion for Leave to Reply in Support of Dismissal by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc(Chiles, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Friday, December 29, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Correction Fri 12/29 9:57 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re7 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the linkage to6 Response. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 28, 2023
7 7 brief Brief in Support Thu 12/28 3:46 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re2 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Brief In Support In Opposition to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Janene Sanders. (Porter, Austin)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/28 3:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re2 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Response to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Janene Sanders. (Porter, Austin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/21 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn V. Larkin on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Larkin, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 12/20 11:27 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) WALMART INC.'S RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURES by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Chiles, E.)
Related: [-]
3 3 brief Brief in Support Wed 12/20 11:26 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re2 Motion to Dismiss filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc. (Chiles, E.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Dismiss Wed 12/20 11:24 AM
MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Wal-Mart Stores East LP, Walmart Inc (Chiles, E.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Janene Sanders. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT3730.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)
Related: [-]