Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Referred: Benecia B Moore
Case #: 4:23-cv-00905
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Defendant
Denise Atwood
Defendant
Eric S Higgins
Defendant
George Belt
Plaintiff
James Lewis Hopkins

GPO Aug 29 2024
ORDER approving and adopting 29 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in its entirety; granting 18 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and dimissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff James Lewis Hopkins's conditions-of-confinement claims against all Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 08/29/2024. (llg)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
46 46 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/31 11:13 AM
RESPONSE to42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by James Lewis Hopkins. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
45 45 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/21 4:06 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff has until and including 4/21/2025, to file a Response to42 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 3/21/2025. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
44 44 misc Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) Thu 03/20 1:26 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Denise Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins.(Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit No. A - Affidavit of Sgt. Hill,
Att: 2 Exhibit No. A1 - Arrest & Booking,
Att: 3 Exhibit A2 - Requests & Grievances,
Att: 4 Exhibit No. A4 - Incident Reports,
Att: 5 Exhibit No. B - Affidavit of Sheriff Higgins,
Att: 6 Exhibit No. C - Affidavit of Atwood,
Att: 7 Exhibit No. D - Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories
43 43 brief Brief in Support Thu 03/20 1:22 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re42 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Denise Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins. (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Partial Summary Judgment Thu 03/20 1:21 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Denise Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
41 41 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/28 2:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re39 Motion for Extension of Time, filed by James Lewis Hopkins. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
40 40 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 02/24 11:50 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part Defendants'39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is now due on or before Friday, March 28, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 2/24/2025. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
39 39 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/21 9:42 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Eric S Higgins, Denise Atwood, George Belt (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
38 38 order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 02/04 12:27 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel34 . Defendants responded to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production on December 19, 202435 -1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 2/4/2025. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
37 37 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 01/28 9:08 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James Lewis Hopkins. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
36 36 discov Answer to Interrogatories Tue 01/14 11:27 AM
ANSWER to Interrogatories by James Lewis Hopkins. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
35 35 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/08 1:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION to Compel filed by Eric S Higgins, Denise Atwood, George Belt.(Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit No. A - Response to Discovery
Friday, January 03, 2025
34 34 motion Compel Fri 01/03 11:53 AM
MOTION to Compel by James Lewis Hopkins. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
33 33 order Order Mon 11/25 4:01 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER regarding Plaintiff's32 Request for Production of Documents. Plaintiff is reminded that discovery requests should be sent directly to Defendants' counsel, not filed with the Court. (Doc.3 at 2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 11/25/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
32 32 discov Request for Production of Documents Wed 11/20 3:07 PM
REQUEST for Production of Documents by James Lewis Hopkins. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
31 31 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/30 12:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties must complete discovery on or before 1/27/2025, and file any dispositive motion on the merits on or before 2/26/2025. Defendants are granted leave to depose Plaintiff if they so choose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 8/30/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
30 30 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Partial Report and Recommendations Thu 08/29 12:37 PM
ORDER approving and adopting29 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in its entirety; granting18 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and dimissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff James Lewis Hopkins's conditions-of-confinement claims against all Defendants. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 08/29/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
29 29 motion Partial Report and Recommendations Fri 08/09 4:12 PM
PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that18 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment be granted; and Hopkins's conditions-of-confinement claims against all Defendants be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 8/9/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 07/10 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James Lewis Hopkins. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
27 27 3 pgs order Order Tue 06/18 5:10 PM
ORDER directing Plaintiff James Lewis Hopkins to file, on or before Monday, 7/8/2024, a response to Defendants' Reply Affidavits (Docs.25 -1,25 -2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 6/18/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 05/30 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James Lewis Hopkins. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 02/22 12:39 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies) filed by Denise Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins.(Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit No. A - Affidavit of Sgt. Hill,
Att: 2 Exhibit No. B - Affidavit of Belt
Thursday, February 15, 2024
24 24 misc Response to Statement of Facts Thu 02/15 11:43 AM
RESPONSE to20 Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1), filed by James Lewis Hopkins. (llg)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/15 11:38 AM
RESPONSE to18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies) filed by James Lewis Hopkins. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
22 22 utility Notice of Docket Correction Mon 02/05 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re17 Request for Production of Documents. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (illegible pages) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry17 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
utility Notice of Docket Correction Thu 01/25 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re21 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the deadline to file a response to the defendants' motion for summary judgment as 2/19/2024 as marked on the Order. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Wed 01/24 10:35 AM
ORDER allowing Plaintiff until and including 2/16/2024, to file a Response to18 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 1/24/2024. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
20 20 misc Statement of Facts (Local Rule 56.1) Fri 01/19 9:54 AM
STATEMENT OF FACTS (Local Rule 56.1) re18 Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies) filed by Denise Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins.(Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit No. A - Affidavit of Sgt. Hill,
Att: 2 Exhibit No. A1 - Arrest & Booking Information,
Att: 3 Exhibit No. A2 - Requests & Grievances,
Att: 4 Exhibit No. A5 - Policies & Procedures
19 19 brief Brief in Support Fri 01/19 9:52 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re18 Motion for Summary Judgment (Partial Motion for Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies) filed by Denise Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins. (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Fri 01/19 9:50 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies) by Denise Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
17 17 discov Request for Production of Documents Fri 01/05 1:22 PM
REQUEST for Production of Documents and Interrogatories by James Lewis Hopkins.(csf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/26 3:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. George Belt served on 12/7/2023. (ajj)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/26 3:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Denise Atwood served on 12/7/2023. (ajj)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/26 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed. Eric S Higgins served on 12/7/2023. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/22 9:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: If Defendants intend to raise a defense that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his available administrative remedies, they must raise that issue in a motion for summary judgment filed on or before 1/22/2024. Discovery that is not related to the issue of exhaustion is stayed until further order from the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket sheet to reflect the correct spelling of Defendant Atwood's name as provided in her Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 12/22/2023. (kdr) (Docket text modified on 12/22/2023 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
12 12 notice Consent Notice Thu 12/21 11:14 AM
NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (kdr)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/21 9:20 AM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dinese Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins.(Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/21 9:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Dugger on behalf of Dinese Atwood, George Belt, Eric S Higgins (Dugger, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
9 9 order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 12/08 4:04 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel8 is DENIED. A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action, but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the plaintiff's ability to investigate and present his case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears he is capable of prosecuting his claims without appointed counsel at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 12/8/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
8 8 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 12/01 2:01 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James Lewis Hopkins. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/16 11:20 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for the following Defendants: Eric S. Higgins, Dinese Atwood, and George Belt; directing the USMS to serve the summons,2 Complaint, and this Order on each of the Defendants at the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore on 11/16/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 11/16 2:39 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 11/14 3:30 PM
ORDER adopting4 Recommendation as this Court's findings in its entirety; allowing Hopkins to proceed with his due process claims against all Defendants; and dismissing Hopkins's retaliation, false disciplinary, access to the courts,Sixth Amendment right to counsel, freedom of association, and official capacity claims. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/14/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
5 5 misc Notice of Reassignment Thu 11/02 12:28 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. The Clerk's office has reassigned the referral of this case to Magistrate Judge Benecia B. Moore. Signed at the direction of the Court on 11/2/2023.(jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
4 4 motion Partial Report and Recommendations Tue 10/24 1:16 PM
PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Hopkins be allowed to proceed with his due process claims against all Defendants; and Hopkins's retaliation, false disciplinary, access to the courts, Sixth Amendment right to counsel, freedom of association, and official capacity claims be dismissed. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/24/2023. (llg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
3 3 3 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Tue 10/03 3:49 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting1 Plaintiff's IFP Motion; directing monthly payments be collected from Plaintiff's institutional account, until a total of $350 has been paid to the Clerk of Court; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Jail Administrator for Pulaski County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 10/3/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by James Lewis Hopkins. (ldb)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/29 3:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Lewis Hopkins. (ldb)
Related: [-]