Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Billy Roy Wilson
Referred: Patricia S Harris
Case #: 4:23-cv-00908
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Oct 12, 2023
Defendant
Brandon Carroll
Defendant
Gloria Washington
Defendant
James Gibson
Plaintiff
Myron Newjean Anderson Jr

GPO Oct 03 2023
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending 1 Anderson's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be denied; this case be dismissed without prejudice; and Anderson be given 30 days to reopen the case by paying the $402 filing and administrative fees in full and filing a Motion to Reopen. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/03/2023. (llg)
GPO Oct 12 2023
ORDER approving and adopting 3 Proposed Findings and Recommendation in all respects; denying 1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing, without prejudice, this case; and giving Anderson 30 days to reopen the case by paying the $402 filing and administrative fees in full and filing a Motion to Reopen. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/12/2023. (ldb)
GPO Oct 12 2023
JUDGMENT: Based on 5 Order, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/12/2023. (ldb)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, January 29, 2024
17 17 appeal USCA Mandate Mon 01/29 9:47 AM
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the judgment of 1/29/2024 as to8 Notice of Appeal filed by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr. (jbh)
Related: [-]
16 16 appeal USCA Judgment Mon 01/29 9:39 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to8 Notice of Appeal filed by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr: This appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. The motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis is denied. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
15 15 appeal USCA Order Mon 11/27 12:45 PM
ORDER of USCA as to8 Notice of Appeal filed by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (jbh)
Related: [-]
14 14 appeal USCA Order Mon 11/27 12:40 PM
ORDER of USCA as to8 Notice of Appeal filed by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr: Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 12/27/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
13 13 appeal USCA Docketing Letter Mon 11/27 12:33 PM
USCA Docketing Letter as to8 Notice of Appeal filed by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr. USCA Case Number 23-3573 (jbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 24, 2023
12 12 appeal Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement Fri 11/24 12:43 PM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to8 Notice of Appeal re5 Order and6 Judgment. (cmn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Reopen Case Wed 11/01 8:15 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and10 Motion to Reopen Case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/01/23. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
10 10 motion Reopen Case Tue 10/31 11:12 AM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr. (jbh)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/31 11:10 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr. (jbh)
Related: [-]
8 8 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 10/31 11:08 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to5 Order,6 Judgment by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
7 7 appeal Appellate Filing Fee Notice Thu 10/12 2:05 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Judgment 1983 Thu 10/12 1:54 PM
JUDGMENT: Based on5 Order, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/12/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations ~Util - Terminate Motions Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 10/12 1:48 PM
ORDER approving and adopting3 Proposed Findings and Recommendation in all respects; denying1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing, without prejudice, this case; and giving Anderson 30 days to reopen the case by paying the $402 filing and administrative fees in full and filing a Motion to Reopen. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/12/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
4 4 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Thu 10/12 11:07 AM
OBJECTIONS to3 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr. (llg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
3 3 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 10/03 11:29 AM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending1 Anderson's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis be denied; this case be dismissed without prejudice; and Anderson be given 30 days to reopen the case by paying the $402 filing and administrative fees in full and filing a Motion to Reopen. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/03/2023. (llg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 09/29 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr. (llg)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/29 4:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Myron Newjean Anderson, Jr. (llg)
Related: [-]