Original Case: 3:19-cv-18400

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02655
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023
Terminated:Dec 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 06, 2024 4:48 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
ELECTROCORE INC
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BTIG LLC
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling
contact info
Philip S. Rosen
Zeichner Ellman & Krause
contact info
Adam Hakki
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling
contact info
Kerry A. Duffy
Zeichner Ellman & Krause
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JMP SECURITRIES LLC
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling
contact info
Philip S. Rosen
Zeichner Ellman & Krause
contact info
Adam Hakki
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling
contact info
Kerry A. Duffy
Zeichner Ellman & Krause
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CANTOR FITZGERALD & CO
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling
contact info
Philip S. Rosen
Zeichner Ellman & Krause
contact info
Adam Hakki
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling
contact info
Kerry A. Duffy
Zeichner Ellman & Krause
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
EVERCORE GROUP LLC
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling
contact info
Philip S. Rosen
Zeichner Ellman & Krause
contact info
Adam Hakki
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling
contact info
Kerry A. Duffy
Zeichner Ellman & Krause
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CORE VENTURES IV LLC
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CORE VENTURES II LLC
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEPHEN L. ONDRA
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES L.L. TULLIS
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID M. RUBIN
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL W. ROSS
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TREVOR J. MOODY
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS J. ERRICO
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NICHOLAS COLUCCI
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH P. ERRICO
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL G. ATIEH
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CARRIE S. COX
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRIAN POSNER
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GLENN S. VRANIAK
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
FRANCIS R. AMATO
Represented By
Jonathan S. Jemison
Dentons US
contact info
Kenneth J. Pfaehler
Dentons US
contact info
Jonathan D. Henry
Dentons US
contact info
Movant - Appellant
In re: CAROLE TIBBS
Represented By
Melissa A. Fortunato
Bragar Eagel & Squire
contact info
Marion C. Passmore
Bragar Eagel & Squire
contact info
Lawrence P. Eagel
Bragar Eagel & Squire
contact info
Movant - Appellant
CAROLE TIBBS
Represented By
Melissa A. Fortunato
Bragar Eagel & Squire
contact info
Marion C. Passmore
Bragar Eagel & Squire
contact info
Lawrence P. Eagel
Bragar Eagel & Squire
contact info

GPO Dec 05 2024
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: CHAGARES, PORTER and CHUNG, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 18. Judge: PORTER Authoring.

Docket last updated: 12/06/2024 4:49 AM EST
Thursday, September 28, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Carole Tibbs in District Court No. 3-19-cv-18400. (CLW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 2 pgs District Court Judgment
Att: 3 1 pgs Caption
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (CLW)
Related: [-]