Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Orinda D Evans
Case #: 1:14-cv-03525
Nature of Suit310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2014
Terminated:Jan 29, 2016
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 3:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Spirit Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Arthur James Park
Mozley, Finlayson & Loggins, LLP
contact info
John Arthur Mozley
Mozley Finlayson & Loggins
contact info
Defendant
International Aero Engines, AG
Represented By
Jay Michael O'Brien
Strawinski & Stout, P.C.
contact info
James Stephens Strawinski
Strawinski & Stout, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Askew
Represented By
Bruce Andrew Lampert
Katzman Lampert & Mcclune
contact info
Plaintiff
Fred Edwards
Represented By
Bruce Andrew Lampert
Katzman Lampert & Mcclune
contact info
Plaintiff
Juwuan Godwin
Represented By
Bruce Andrew Lampert
Katzman Lampert & Mcclune
contact info
Plaintiff
Samer Madanet
Represented By
Bruce Andrew Lampert
Katzman Lampert & Mcclune
contact info
Plaintiff
Casey Rogers
Represented By
E. Alan Armstrong
Alan Armstrong, Attorney At Law
contact info
Bruce Andrew Lampert
Katzman Lampert & Mcclune
contact info


1. Georgia lawsuit questions Spirit Airlines' safety (wsbtv.com)
Submitted Fri 02/06/2015
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 29, 2016
47 47 order Order to Dismiss Fri 01/29 4:12 PM
Order regarding46 Notice of Settlement. It is Ordered that this action be DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 01/29/16. (fap)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/29 4:12 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (fap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2015
46 46 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 12/30 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by International Aero Engines, AG, Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Strawinski, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
45 45 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 12/18 10:01 AM
ORDER granting44 Motion to Consolidate Cases. IT IS ORDERED that the remaining passengers from the Spirit I case are to be consolidated into the Spirit II case. The Spirit I case is to be dismissed after the filing of Notices of Settlement in the five settled cases. This is to be done within 30 days. The Spirit II case shall proceed with the addition of the White/Chapman Plaintiffs who should be added to the case caption of Spirit II and prosecuted pursuant to the Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Order entered therein. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 12/16/15. (fap)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 11, 2015
44 44 motion Consolidate Cases Fri 12/11 11:34 AM
First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order CONSENT ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATION OF CASES
Friday, October 23, 2015
42 42 discov Certificate of Service Fri 10/23 12:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second RFP of Documents to International Aero Engines AG by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 22, 2015
43 43 order Order on Motion for Clarification Fri 10/23 3:10 PM
ORDER granting40 Motion for Clarification. It is hereby ORDERED that the 10 months of discovery allowed in the scheduling order entered on May 29, 201525 , following plaintiffs' filing of an amended complaint on March 11, 201512 adding two new plaintiffs and a new defendant, allows the parties to conduct discovery through and including February 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 10/22/15. (fap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 21, 2015
41 41 discov Certificate of Service Wed 10/21 6:52 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant IAE International Aero Engines AG's Amended Response to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories by International Aero Engines, AG.(Strawinski, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 19, 2015
40 40 motion Clarification Mon 10/19 11:04 AM
Joint MOTION for Clarification of Scheduling Order Regarding Length of Discovery by Spirit Airlines, Inc..(Landrum, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order Regarding Length of Discovery
Thursday, October 08, 2015
39 39 discov Certificate of Service Thu 10/08 1:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Request for Admissions, Interrogatories and Request for Production by International Aero Engines, AG.(Strawinski, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2015
38 38 order Order on Motion for Order Thu 09/24 1:44 PM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 09/23/15. (fap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 22, 2015
37 37 motion For Order Tue 09/22 12:59 PM
Consent MOTION for Order for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Spirit Airlines, Inc..(Landrum, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Monday, September 14, 2015
36 36 discov Certificate of Service Mon 09/14 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Amended Responses by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2015
35 35 discov Certificate of Service Wed 09/09 1:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Serving Discovery by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
34 34 discov Certificate of Service Mon 08/31 5:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate Regarding Discovery by Spirit Airlines, Inc..(Landrum, Anne)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2015
33 33 misc Stipulation Fri 08/21 3:36 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Respond to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Spirit Airlines, Inc. by Casey Rogers. (Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
32 32 discov Certificate of Service Fri 08/21 8:13 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
31 31 discov Certificate of Service Fri 07/31 3:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Discovery by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 24, 2015
30 30 misc Stipulation Fri 07/24 8:00 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time by Casey Rogers. (Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 21, 2015
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/21 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M. Landrum on behalf of Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Landrum, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
28 28 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 06/03 6:23 PM
Initial Disclosures by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
27 27 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 06/03 5:02 PM
Initial Disclosures by Spirit Airlines, Inc..(Mozley, John)
Related: [-]
26 26 discov Initial Disclosures Wed 06/03 12:55 PM
Initial Disclosures by International Aero Engines, AG.(Strawinski, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Declarations
Friday, May 29, 2015
25 25 order Scheduling Order Mon 06/01 11:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:24 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court orders that the time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: 10 MONTHS' Discovery will be allowed. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 05/27/15. (fap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 21, 2015
24 24 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 05/21 4:41 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Defendant IAE International Aero Engines AG's Jurisdictional Statement/Objection
Monday, May 04, 2015
23 23 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/04 1:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Aero Engines, AG identifying Corporate Parent Pratt & Whitney Aero Engines International GmbH, Corporate Parent MTU Aero Engines GmbH, Corporate Parent Japanese Aero Engines Corporation, Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation, Other Affiliate Kawasaki Heavy Indusries, Ltd, Other Affiliate Ishikawajima-Harima Heavy Industries Co., Ltd, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd for International Aero Engines, AG by International Aero Engines, AG.(O'Brien, Jay)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Jury Demand Mon 05/04 1:54 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by International Aero Engines, AG. (O'Brien, Jay)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 05/04 1:27 PM
ANSWER to12 First Amended Complaint by International Aero Engines, AG.(O'Brien, Jay) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/4/2015 to link to correct docket entry per attorney (ryc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 01, 2015
20 20 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/02 2:25 PM
CONSENT ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re12 Amended Complaint. International Aero Engines, AG Answer due 5/4/2015. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 04/01/15. (fap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2015
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 03/31 2:29 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Amended Complaint, by Benjamin Askew, Fred Edwards, Juwuan Godwin, International Aero Engines, AG, Samer Madanet, Casey Rogers, Spirit Airlines, Inc..(Strawinski, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order
Friday, March 20, 2015
18 18 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/23 9:44 AM
ORDER granting10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Bruce Andrew Lampert. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 03/18/15. (fap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2015
17 17 misc Jury Demand Wed 03/18 5:32 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Spirit Airlines, Inc.. (Mozley, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 03/18 5:29 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Spirit Airlines, Inc..(Mozley, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2015
15 15 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 03/12 10:59 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to International Aero Engines, AG.(fap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Wed 03/11 4:31 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Summons in a Civil Action - First Amended Complaint by Casey Rogers (Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Wed 03/11 4:28 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Summons in A Civil Action - First Amended Complaint by Casey Rogers (Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/11 4:19 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against Spirit Airlines, Inc.with Jury Demand, filed by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
11 11 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 03/10 3:24 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 03/09/15. (fap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2015
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 03/05 10:03 AM
Submission of9 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and to Extend Time to Accomplish Rule 26(f) Conference and Submit Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (fap)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 27, 2015
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Fri 02/27 4:18 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:10 APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce Andrew Lampert Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Bruce Andrew Lampert added appearing on behalf of Benjamin Askew, Fred Edwards, Juwuan Godwin, Samer Madanet, Casey Rogers (pb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 18, 2015
10 10 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/18 9:00 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce Andrew Lampert Pro Hac Vice by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice
Friday, February 06, 2015
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Fri 02/06 10:12 AM
RETURN of5 APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce Andrew Lampert Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5632402) to attorney for correction re: form. (pb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 04, 2015
9 9 motion Leave to File Document Wed 02/04 7:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and to Extend Time to Accomplish Rule 26(f) Conference and Submit Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan by Casey Rogers.(Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Unopposed Order
Monday, February 02, 2015
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 02/02 6:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Spirit Airlines, Inc.. (Park, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 30, 2015
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 01/30 3:08 PM
First Certificate of Interested Persons by Benjamin Askew, Fred Edwards, Juwuan Godwin, Samer Madanet, Casey Rogers. (Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/30 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by E. Alan Armstrong on behalf of Benjamin Askew, Fred Edwards, Juwuan Godwin, Samer Madanet, Casey Rogers (Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/30 11:46 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Bruce Andrew Lampert Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5632402)by Casey Rogers. (Armstrong, E.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 07, 2014
4 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Spirit Airlines, Inc.. (Mozley, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Plaintiff's Complaint by Spirit Airlines, Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/6/2015.(Mozley, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
Related: [-]
Monday, November 03, 2014
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spirit Airlines, Inc. (bdb)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by Spirit Airlines, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-5478204) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit with Complaint and jury demand,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
Submission of1 Notice of Removal for Review. Submitted to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (bdb)
Related: [-]