Original Case: 3:21-cv-00018

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02787
Typecivil / united states as party / other civil
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Sep 29, 2023
Terminated:Oct 17, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2023 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Aysha Gregory
Office of United States Attorney
contact info
Kimberly L. Cole
Office of United States Attorney
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NACHET WILLIAMS-PRINCE
Defendant - Appellee
ST THOMAS EAST END MEDICAL CENTER CORP
Intervenor - Appellant
FRANCIS BROOKS
Represented By
Francis Brooks
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DEISY J. BAUTISTA-DAVILA, as personal representative of the Estate of Angie Zue Brooks and as Guardian of J.B., a minor, (Baby B.)
Represented By
Lee J. Rohn
Lee J. Rohn & Associates
contact info
Rhea R. Lawrence
Lee J. Rohn & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/18/2023 4:34 AM EDT
Friday, September 29, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (ARR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Francis Brooks in District Court No. 3-21-cv-00018. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 2 pgs DC_Order_091223
Att: 3 1 pgs Caption
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (ARR)
Related: [-]
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) any future filings should be in compliance with Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(5) and 3d Cir. L.A.R. 113.12. (ARR)
Related: [-]