Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:23-cv-02227
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:May 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Kingfish On MC, LLC
Represented By
Christine E. Howard
Fisher & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Elysse Victoria Gorney
Fisher Phillips
contact info
Mediator
Carlos Burruezo
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
contact info
Plaintiff
Katie-Leigh Dwinells
Represented By
Ryan D. Barack
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info
Michelle E. Nadeau
Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 20, 2024
20 20 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 05/20 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/20 10:30 AM
ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 and upon review of 18 the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs associated with this matter. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/20/2024. (DEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/17 9:19 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Kingfish On MC, LLC. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
17 17 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/05 9:08 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:23-cv-2227-MSS-UAM. Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed no longer assigned to the case. (MCB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 02/07 10:09 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on April 29, 2024 at 1:30pm before Travis Hollifield. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 02/02 3:24 PM
ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING 14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Continuance of Mediation Deadline. The deadline for the Parties to conduct Mediation is extended to April 30, 2024. All other deadlines in the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order shall remain the same unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/2/2024. (EOJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
14 14 motion Continue Mon 01/29 10:30 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Mediation Deadline by Kingfish On MC, LLC. (Gorney, Elysse)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 12/21 2:10 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 2/15/24 at 1:30 p.m before Travis Hollifield. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/15 9:02 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kingfish On MC, LLC. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/12 2:51 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Katie-Leigh Dwinells. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
utility Set/reset scheduling order deadlines - PUBLIC Mon 12/04 9:23 AM
Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 7/1/2024 (ARL)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
10 10 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 12/01 2:54 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/27/2023 Discovery due by 8/30/2024 Dispositive motions due by 9/30/2024 Pretrial statement due by 1/27/2025 All other motions due by 2/3/2025 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 6/17/2024 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/1/2024 Jury Trial set for the March 2025 trial term which commences on 3/3/2025 at 09:00 AM, with a more precise trial date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/29/2024. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/1/2023. (BCH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
9 9 misc Case Management Report Tue 11/07 9:23 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/09 11:21 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Kingfish On MC, LLC.(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 10/03 2:31 PM
NOTICE to Counsel informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JS)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 10/03 2:30 PM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JS)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 10/03 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christine E. Howard on behalf of Kingfish On MC, LLC. Lead Counsel: Christine Howard. (Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 10/03 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ryan D. Barack on behalf of Katie-Leigh Dwinells. Lead Counsel: Ryan D. Barack. (Barack, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 10/03 10:18 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Michelle E. Nadeau, Ryan D. Barack, Christine E. Howard of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LMW)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 10/02 4:23 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:23-cv-02227-MSS-JSS. (JG)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 10/02 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 6th Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, Florida, case number 23-008066-CI filed in State Court on August 17, 2023. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-21310790 filed by Kingfish on MC, LLC, d/b/a Bert's Barracuda Harley Davidson.(Howard, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal