Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 4:23-cv-00925
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1346 Tort Claim
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Jan 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 4:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By
Lindsey Mitcham Lorence
U. S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Michael Smith
Defendant
Maria T Travis
Plaintiff
Derrick Hardy
10 Cobblestone Dr
Greenbrier, AR 72058

GPO Jan 03 2024
ORDER granting 11 VA's motion to dismiss; and dismissing without prejudice Hardy's claims. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/3/2024. (ljb)
GPO Jan 03 2024
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 17 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/3/2024. (ljb)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
18 18 order Judgment Wed 01/03 1:26 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with17 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/3/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
17 17 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 01/03 1:23 PM
ORDER granting11 VA's motion to dismiss; and dismissing without prejudice Hardy's claims. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/3/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/02 4:37 PM
PROOF of Service by Derrick Hardy. (jap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/14 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Derrick Hardy. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/12 11:49 AM
Proof of Service of Plaintiff Opposition to11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Derrick Hardy. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/21 11:13 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Derrick Hardy. (CDs of Exhibit 2 and Exhibit 3 filed conventionally and maintained in the Clerks office.) (ajj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
12 12 brief Brief in Support Tue 11/14 2:08 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Department of Veterans Affairs. (Lorence, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 11/14 2:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Department of Veterans Affairs (Lorence, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/31 9:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed/Proof of Service by Derrick Hardy. Maria T Travis co Department of Veterans Affairs served on 10/6/2023. (fjg)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/31 9:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed/Proof of Service by Derrick Hardy. Michael Smith co Department of Veterans Affairs served on 10/6/2023. (fjg)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/31 9:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed/Proof of Service by Derrick Hardy. Maria T Travis co US Attorney General served on 10/6/2023. (fjg)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/31 9:19 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed/Proof of Service by Derrick Hardy. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 10/6/2023. (fjg)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/31 9:18 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed/Proof of Service by Derrick Hardy. Department of Veterans Affairs co US Attorney General served on 10/11/2023. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 10/18 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed/Proof of Service by Derrick Hardy. Michael Smith served via certified mail on 10/10/2023. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Tue 10/17 12:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed/Proof of Service by Derrick Hardy. Department of Veterans Affairs served via certified mail on 10/5/2023. (jap)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/17 12:02 PM
PROOF of Service of complaint and summons, filed by Derrick Hardy. Michael Smith served via certified mail on 10/5/2023. (jap)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/17 11:58 AM
PROOF of Service of complaint and summons, filed by Derrick Hardy. Maria T Travis served via certified mail on 10/5/2023. (jap)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/02 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Derrick Hardy against All Defendants. (Fee $ 402, Receipt Number LIT3757.) Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet