Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Referred: Patricia S Harris
Case #: 4:23-cv-00928
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 12, 2024
13 13 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 04/12 11:09 AM
PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that plaintiff's2 complaint and11 amended complaint be dismissed without prejudice. Objections due 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/12/2024. (jak)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/12 2:19 PM
ORDER allowing Ruiz one final opportunity to clarify his claims in accordance with the Court's 11/17/20236 Order, by filing a complete operative amended complaint on the form provided; and directing the Clerk of Court to send Ruiz a blank 1983 form and a copy of the Court's 11/17/20236 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 2/12/2024. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/02 11:11 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tony Ruiz. (ldb) (Docket entry modified on 2/2/2024 to correct the filing event)(jak)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Fri 02/02 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re11 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event as "AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tony Ruiz" as marked on the document and pursuant to instruction from Chambers. (jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
10 10 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 01/19 9:18 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting9 Motion to Extend Time to file amended complaint. Ruiz' amended complaint is due no later than February 19, 2024. This is the last extension the Court will grant. Plaintiff should only describe the facts supporting his claims in his amended complaint - he should not attach grievances, policies, or other documentation. See Initial Order for Pro Se Plaintiffs (Doc. No.3 , Paragraph SIXTH). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/19/2024. (cfd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
9 9 motion Extend Time Thu 01/18 3:29 PM
MOTION to Extend Time by Tony Ruiz. (llg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
8 8 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 12/12 4:01 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting7 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due January 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/12/2023. (dml)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
7 7 motion Extend Time Fri 12/08 10:27 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Tony Ruiz. (llg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
6 6 5 pgs order Order Fri 11/17 2:01 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to send a blank 1983 complaint form to Ruiz; and directing Ruiz to use this form to file his amended complaint within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/17/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/23 4:32 PM
NOTICE re4 Affidavit, by Tony Ruiz. (ldb)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Affidavit Mon 10/23 4:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Tony Ruiz. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
3 3 4 pgs order Order Directing Prisoner Payment Wed 10/04 10:44 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS granting1 IFP motion; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Unit; and the appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/04/2023. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 10/02 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tony Ruiz. (wbb)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/02 4:31 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tony Ruiz. (wbb)
Related: [-]