Arkansas Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00025
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Oct 02, 2023
Defendant
Antwone Howell
Defendant
Jarvis Bennett
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Apr 22 2025
JUDGMENT as to Antwone Howell. Count 3: 37 months imprisonment; 3 years supervised release; $100 special assessment fee. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 4/22/2025. (fcd)
GPO May 06 2025
JUDGMENT as to Jarvis Bennett. Count 1: 57 months imprisonment to run Consecutive to undischarged term; 3 years supervised release; $100 special assessment fee. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 5/6/2025. (fcd)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.