Original Case: 3:22-cv-04699

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02791
Typecivil / united states as party / civil rights
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Oct 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 23, 2024 6:05 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES COURTS
Represented By
J. Andrew Ruymann
Office of United States Attorney
contact info
Defendant - Non-Participating
ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES COURTS
Represented By
J. Andrew Ruymann
Office of United States Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WILLIAM HARDY SAUNDERS, JR., Artist and Photographer, Black American; and, as disabled-American also on behalf minority group members as Class he represents, et al.
Represented By
William Hardy Saunders Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/23/2024 6:05 AM EDT
Monday, October 02, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant William Hardy Saunders, Jr. in District Court No. 3-22-cv-04699. (JK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 8 pgs District Court Memorandum
Att: 3 2 pgs District Court Order
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing Order Excess Pagination
Att: 6 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (JK)
Related: [-]