Original Case: 2:19-cv-05488

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-02742
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Feb 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Feb 12, 2024 4:39 AM EST
Defendant
KARE SCHULTZ, as President and CEO of Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Represented By
Brandon S. Shemtob
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Larry J. Rappoport
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant
RON YANIV, as President and CEO of Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Represented By
Brandon S. Shemtob
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Larry J. Rappoport
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC
Represented By
Brandon S. Shemtob
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Larry J. Rappoport
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD
Represented By
Brandon S. Shemtob
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Larry J. Rappoport
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KARE SHULTZ, as President and CEO of Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd.
Represented By
Brandon S. Shemtob
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Larry J. Rappoport
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RON YANIV, as SVP Global Compensation and Benefits
Represented By
Brandon S. Shemtob
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Larry J. Rappoport
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RANDOLPH KEUCH
Represented By
Jennifer M. Chalal
Spector Gadon Rosen & Vinci
contact info
Alan B. Epstein
Spector Gadon Rosen & Vinci
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/12/2024 4:39 AM EST
Monday, October 02, 2023
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Randolph Keuch in District Court No. 2-19-cv-05488. (SB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order
Att: 3 40 pgs District Court Memorandum
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing Order
Att: 6 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (SB)
Related: [-]