Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:23-cv-01089
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 30, 2024 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Reverse Group, Inc.
Represented By
Adam V. Orlacchio
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Matthew A. Homyk
contact info
Robert T. Lieber, Jr.
contact info
James G. Gorman, III
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GOLO, LLC
Represented By
Dana Kathryn Severance
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, January 22, 2024
19 19 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Mon 01/22 10:00 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s).(mdb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Stipulation of Dismissal
Thursday, January 18, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 01/18 11:46 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by GOLO, LLC. (Severance, Dana)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Civil Thu 01/18 12:10 PM
CASE CLOSED (dlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 01/11 2:51 PM
SO ORDERED re17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to January 25, 2024 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Reverse Group, Inc. answer due 1/25/2024). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/11/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
17 17 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 01/10 7:26 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME ANSWER to January 25, 2024 - filed by Reverse Group, Inc.. (Gorman, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
16 16 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 01/03 4:33 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 10, 2024 - filed by Reverse Group, Inc.. (Gorman, James)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 01/03 4:45 PM
SO ORDERED re16 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 10, 2024 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Reverse Group, Inc. answer due 1/10/2024). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/3/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 01/02 3:08 PM
SO ORDERED re15 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 3, 2024 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Reverse Group, Inc. answer due 1/3/2024). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/2/2024. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
15 15 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 12/27 10:41 AM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to January 3, 2024 - filed by GOLO, LLC. (Severance, Dana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 12/20 2:56 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 27, 2023 - filed by Reverse Group, Inc.. (Gorman, James)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 12/20 3:21 PM
SO ORDERED re14 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 27, 2023 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Reverse Group, Inc. answer due 12/27/2023). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/20/2023. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 12/13 11:38 AM
SO ORDERED re13 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 20, 2023 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Reverse Group, Inc. answer due 12/20/2023). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/13/2023. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
13 13 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 12/12 4:58 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 20, 2023 - filed by Reverse Group, Inc.. (Gorman, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Tue 12/05 9:14 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Matthew A. Homyk and Robert T. Lieber, Jr for Reverse Group, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/04 9:06 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert T. Lieber, Jr. - filed by Reverse Group, Inc..(Gorman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Robert T. Lieber,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/04 9:04 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew A. Homyk - filed by Reverse Group, Inc..(Gorman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Matthew A. Homyk,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
order SO ORDERED Mon 12/04 12:55 PM
SO ORDERED re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew A. Homyk,12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert T. Lieber, Jr. filed by Reverse Group, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/4/2023. (dlw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/30 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam V. Orlacchio on behalf of Reverse Group, Inc. (Orlacchio, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 11/27 9:26 AM
SO ORDERED, re9 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 13, 2023 filed by Reverse Group, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Reverse Group, Inc. answer due 12/13/2023. Ordered by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/27/2023. (as)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
9 9 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 11/22 2:14 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to December 13, 2023 - filed by Reverse Group, Inc.. (Gorman, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/25 9:45 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Tue 10/24 12:30 PM
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Dana K. Severance, regarding corrected civil cover sheet.(Severance, Dana) Modified on 10/24/2023 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
7 7 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 10/17 8:40 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to a Complaint - filed by GOLO, LLC. (Severance, Dana) Modified on 10/17/2023 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 10/17 9:59 AM
SO ORDERED, re7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to a Complaint filed by GOLO, LLC (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Reverse Group, Inc. answer due 11/23/2023). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2023. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/04 1:27 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/03 4:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GOLO, LLC.Reverse Group, Inc. served on 10/3/2023, answer due 10/24/2023. (Severance, Dana)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued - Electronic Service Tue 10/03 8:39 AM
Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (vfm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 10/03 8:39 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by GOLO, LLC. (vfm)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Tue 10/03 8:38 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 4,436,947 ;5,231,000 ;6,569,622. (vfm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 10/03 8:36 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 8:36 AM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Reverse Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BDEDC-4238160.) - filed by GOLO, LLC. (vfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet