Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Referred: Joe J Volpe
Case #: 3:23-cv-00201
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Nov 29, 2023
Defendant
Kevin Molder
Defendant
Trisha Marshall
Plaintiff
Fidencio Garcia-Garcia

GPO Nov 07 2023
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that the amended complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted 8. The Court recommend dismissal count, in the future, as a strike under 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/7/2023. (lej)
GPO Nov 29 2023
ORDER adopting 10 recommended disposition; and dismissing without prejudice Fidencio Garcia-Garcia's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/29/2023. (ljb)
GPO Nov 29 2023
JUDGMENT: Consistent with 11 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/29/2023. (ljb)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
13 13 appeal Appellate Filing Fee Notice Wed 11/29 1:55 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Judgment 1983 Wed 11/29 1:52 PM
JUDGMENT: Consistent with11 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/29/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 11/29 1:48 PM
ORDER adopting10 recommended disposition; and dismissing without prejudice Fidencio Garcia-Garcia's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/29/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
10 10 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 11/07 2:59 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that the amended complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted8 . The Court recommend dismissal count, in the future, as a strike under 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/7/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/02 2:33 PM
NOTICE by Fidencio Garcia-Garcia. (ldb)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/02 2:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fidencio Garcia-Garcia, filed by Fidencio Garcia-Garcia. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
7 7 order Order on Motion for Copies Fri 10/27 1:39 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for copies6 Plaintiff's motion suggests he wants a complaint form, but that form was mailed on 10/18/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/27/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Copies Fri 10/27 11:49 AM
MOTION for Copies by Fidencio Garcia-Garcia. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
5 5 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/18 1:57 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application4 . The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the Greene County Detention Facility Administrator. Service is not appropriate at this time. The Clerk shall mail a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form (but not an IFP Application) to Plaintiff with a copy of this order. If Plaintiff wishes to amend the complaint, he must complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, label it an "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/18/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/16 4:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fidencio Garcia-Garcia (kdr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
3 3 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 10/04 9:08 AM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's IFP Application as incomplete1 . The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff an IFP Application (but not a Calculation Sheet). Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $402 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/4/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Fidencio Garcia-Garcia.(kdr)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/03 11:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fidencio Garcia-Garcia. (kdr)
Related: [-]