Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Lee P Rudofsky
Case #: 3:23-cv-00202
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2024 3:42 AM CDT
Defendant
John Does
Defendant
Douglas James Minter
Represented By
John Carter Fairley
Barber Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Manual Moment
Represented By
Jordan Shelby Phillips
Mcdaniel Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Bobby R. McDaniel
Mcdaniel Law Firm, PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Pat Capital Inc
Terminated: 12/01/2023
Defendant
Toundas Marketing Group LLC
Terminated: 12/01/2023
Represented By
Deborah S. Denton
Anderson, Murphy & Hopkins, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, February 13, 2025
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/13 10:22 AM
AMENDED FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial reset for 12/2/2025 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro, Arkansas Courtroom (large) 324 before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Motions to Amend and Join Other Parties due by 6/5/2025; Discovery due by 7/7/2025; Motions due by 8/4/2025; Status Report due by 8/4/2025; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 11/3/2025. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/13/2025. (hml)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 02/13 9:49 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting13 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. A new scheduling order is forthcoming. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 2/13/2025. (hml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
13 13 motion Extend Time Wed 02/12 3:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Modify Scheduling Order by Manual Moment (Phillips, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/04 1:22 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/30/2025 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro, Arkansas Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Motions to Amend and Join Other Parties due by 3/27/2025; Discovery due by 4/28/2025; Motions due by 5/26/2025; Status Report due by 5/26/2025; and Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 9/1/2025. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/4/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 09/03 4:10 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Manual Moment. (Phillips, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
10 10 order Initial Scheduling Order Mon 06/10 5:13 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/3/2024 and Jury Trial set for 7/22/2025 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro, Arkansas Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/10/2024. (hml)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
9 9 order Order Fri 12/01 9:00 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: The8 Stipulation of Dismissal is a self-executing dismissal without prejudice of all claims against Separate Defendants Toundas Marketing Group, LLC (d/b/a Sports Marketing, LLC TMG) and Pat Capital, Inc. (d/b/a TMG Sports Marketing). Those Defendants should be terminated from the case by the Clerk. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/1/2023. (hml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/21 2:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Against Separate Defendants Toundas Marketing Group, LLC and Pat Capital, Inc. by Manual Moment. (Phillips, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 10/31 8:32 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Toundas Marketing Group LLC (Denton, Deborah)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 8:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah S. Denton on behalf of Toundas Marketing Group LLC (Denton, Deborah)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/31 8:29 AM
Toundas ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Toundas Marketing Group LLC.(Denton, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
service Summons Issued Fri 10/06 11:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Pat Capital Inc, Toundas Marketing Group LLC. (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/04 12:59 PM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/03 5:01 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Douglas James Minter. (ldb)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Manual Moment against All Defendants. (ldb)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 10/03 4:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Douglas James Minter from Randolph County Circuit Court, case number 61CV-23-107. Fee $402, receipt number LIT3787. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet