Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Referred: Joe J Volpe
Case #: 4:23-cv-00915
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
5 5 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 11/28 1:52 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice1 . The Court recommend dismissal count as a strike, in the future, for purposes of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/28/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
4 4 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/16 3:12 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application3 . The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to the Stone County Jail Administrator. Service is not appropriate at this time. The Clerk shall mail a 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint form (but not an IFP Application) to Plaintiff with a copy of this order. If Plaintiff wishes to amend the complaint, he must complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, label it an "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient and his claims may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/16/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/13 2:20 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Berends. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
2 2 3 pgs order Order Wed 10/04 1:26 PM
ORDER that the Clerk shall mail Plaintiff an IFP Application and a Calculation Sheet. Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $402 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/4/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 8:35 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Anthony Berends.(kdr)
Related: [-]