Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Referred: Joe J Volpe
Case #: 4:23-cv-00918
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, November 16, 2023
6 6 misc Mail Returned Thu 11/16 4:03 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brandon Holland re5 Recommended Disposition. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
5 5 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 11/07 3:41 PM
RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice due to a lack of prosecution, and this case be closed1 . The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from an order adopting this recommendation and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/7/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
4 4 misc Mail Returned Mon 11/06 2:56 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brandon Holland re1 Complaint. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
3 3 misc Mail Returned Mon 10/16 2:01 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Brandon Holland re2 Order, IFP application and a calculation sheet. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
2 2 3 pgs order Order Wed 10/04 10:20 AM
ORDER that the Clerk shall mail Plaintiff an IFP Application and a Calculation Sheet. Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the date of this order, either: (a) pay the full $402 filing fee; or (b) file a properly completed IFP Application and Calculation Sheet. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/4/2023. (lej)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 8:55 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Brandon Holland.(kdr)
Related: [-]