Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Referred: Jerome T Kearney
Case #: 4:23-cv-00930
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 misc Notice of Reassignment Wed 04/09 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to the recusal by Judge Billy Roy Wilson, the Clerk's office has randomly reassigned this case to Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/9/2025. (jak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
7 7 answer Response to Habeas Petition Tue 12/19 2:17 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Dexter Payne.(Holt, Kent)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Sentencing Order 0- State v. Jaquez - Case No. 23CR 21-1167
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Sentencing Order - State v. Jaquez - Case No. 23CR 21-1216
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Felony Information - State v. Jaquez - Case No. 23CR-22-644,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Sentencing Order - State v. Jaquez - Case No. 23CR 21-1167
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Sentencing Order - State v. Jaquez - Case No. 23CR 21-1216
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Transcript of Sentencing Hearing - State v. Jaquez - Case No. 23CR 21-1167 & 23CR 21-1216
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Rule 37 Petition - State v. Jaquez - State v. Jaquez - Case No. 23CR 21-1167 & 23CR 21-1216
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - State's Response to Rule 37 Petition - State v. Jaquez - Case No. 23CR 21-1167 & 23CR 21-1216
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Tendered Record - Volume 1-2 of 4 - Jaquez v. State - Case No. CR-23-520,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 - Tendered Record - Volume 3-4 of 4 - Jaquez v. State - Case No. CR-23-520
Friday, December 01, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 12/01 9:20 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petitioner Thomas Jaquez's1 petition for a writ of habeas corpus; and extending the time to, and including, 12/19/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/1/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/27 11:01 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Dexter Payne (Holt, Kent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/14 8:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kent G. Holt on behalf of Dexter Payne (Holt, Kent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Directing Service (State Habeas) ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 11/03 3:03 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this Order on the respondent and the Arkansas Attorney General by mail; directing the Respondent to file an answer, motion or other response to the petition within 21 days after service of this Petition, exclusive of the day of service; and directing the Clerk to update the docket sheet to reflect that Dexter Payne, Director of the Arkansas Division of Correction, is the proper Respondent in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/2/2023. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/01 11:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Jaquez. (llg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
utility Notice of Docket Correction Thu 10/05 12:42 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the filing event and description as, "PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Thomas Jaquez" as indicated by the document. (cmn) (Docket text modified on 10/5/2023 to correct the party name.)(cmn)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Thu 10/05 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re1 Petition and Notice of Docket Correction. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name as, "Thomas Jaquez" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 9:53 AM
COMPLAINT against Arkansas, State of, filed by Thomas Jacquez.(kdr)
Related: [-]