Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Lee P Rudofsky
Referred: Patricia S Harris
Case #: 4:23-cv-00931
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Jan 09, 2024
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jervontae M Cox

GPO Jan 09 2024
ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, 1 Complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order or the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/9/2024. (ldb)
GPO Jan 09 2024
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to 7 Order and prior Orders, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment or any related Orders would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/9/2024. (ldb)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
9 9 appeal Appellate Filing Fee Notice Tue 01/09 2:21 PM
APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ldb)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Judgment 1983 Tue 01/09 2:08 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to7 Order and prior Orders, this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment or any related Orders would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/9/2024. (ldb)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 01/09 2:04 PM
ORDER dismissing, without prejudice,1 Complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order or the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 1/9/2024. (ldb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
6 6 order Order Tue 11/28 11:21 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER. On October 3, 2023, Plaintiff Jervontae M. Cox. was instructed to submit a complete 1983 complaint form and a complete in forma pauperis application or filing fee within 30 days (Doc. No.3 ). Cox has done neither. He filed a notice on October 17, 2023, indicating he has had trouble getting his in forma pauperis paperwork completed (Doc. No.5 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to send Cox another 1983 packet, including a blank in forma pauperis application. If Cox wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he must return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying certificate and calculation sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing and administrative fees within 30 days of the date of this order along with an amended complaint on a 1983 form. The Clerk of Court is directed to send the Warden of the Maximum Security Unit a copy of this Order, so that jail staff may be instructed to assist Cox with his certificate and calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/28/2023. (cfd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/17 4:44 PM
NOTICE by Jervontae M Cox. (llg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 10/12 11:18 AM
NOTICE by Jervontae M Cox. (llg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
3 3 4 pgs order Order Tue 10/03 4:08 PM
INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS directing the Clerk of Court to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this order; and directing Plaintiff to return a completed IFP application within 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 10/03/2023. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
2 2 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/03 1:44 PM
ORDER ON AMICUS BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 3/21/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 11:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Does, filed by Jervontae M Cox.(kdr)
Related: [-]