Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Kristine G Baker
Case #: 4:23-cv-00932
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2023
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 31, 2024 3:42 AM CDT
Defendant
Highland Pellets LLC
Represented By
Matthew Byron Finch
Gill Ragon Owen P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
MOR PPM Inc
Represented By
David M. Donovan
Wdtc Law, P.A.
contact info
James R. Baxter
The Baxter Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, December 27, 2024
44 44 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 12/27 2:19 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re20 Judgment, by Orion Energy Partners Investment Agent LLC (Treece, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
43 43 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 12/10 11:27 AM
ORDER granting42 motion to substitute; and directing the Clerk of the Court to substitute Orion Energy Partners Investment Agent, Inc. for MOR PPM, Inc. as the plaintiff in this matter and to dismiss MOR PPM, Inc. as a party in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/10/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
42 42 motion Substitute Party Fri 12/06 3:33 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Orion Energy Partners Investment Agent, Inc. as Plaintiff by Orion Energy Partners Investment Agent LLC (Treece, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/05 5:09 PM
NOTICE by MOR PPM Inc Assignment of Judgment (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
40 40 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 12/05 3:15 PM
ORDER granting39 motion to withdraw and dismiss writs of garnishment, writs of execution, and interest motion; withdrawing and dismissing without prejudice21 motion to alter or amend the Judgment to include post-award, pre-judgment interest; withdrawing and dismissing without prejudice23 writ of execution,24 writ of garnishment as to Citibank, N.A.,25 writ of garnishment as to Simmons Bank,26 writ of garnishment as to Pinnacle Mountain Holdings V, LLC, and27 writ of garnishment as to Drax Biomass, Inc.; and denying as moot38 motion for leave to file reply to PPM's memorandum response to Orion's objection to the writ of execution. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/5/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Withdraw Thu 12/05 8:01 AM
MOTION to Withdraw26 Writ Issued,23 Writ Issued,24 Writ Issued,21 MOTION to Alter Judgment OR AMEND JUDGMENT TO INCLUDE POST-AWARD, PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST ,27 Writ Issued,25 Writ Issued by MOR PPM Inc (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
38 38 motion Leave to File Document Wed 11/27 11:56 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to MOR PPM, Inc.'s Memorandum Response to Objection to Writ of Execution by Orion Energy Partners Investment Agent LLC(Treece, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
37 37 respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Tue 11/26 9:47 AM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Pinnacle Mountain Holding Company V LLC (Smith, Nancy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
36 36 respoth Response (Non Motion) Tue 11/12 2:13 PM
RESPONSE re35 Objection by MOR PPM Inc (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
35 35 3 pgs misc Objections Wed 11/06 11:35 AM
OBJECTIONS by Orion Energy Partners Investment Agent LLC(Treece, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, November 04, 2024
34 34 order Protective Order Mon 11/04 2:58 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/4/2024. (ldb)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Mon 11/04 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re33 MOTION for Protective Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the proposed order was filed as an attachment to docket entry33 in error. (jak)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
33 33 motion Protective Order Fri 11/01 10:34 AM
MOTION for Protective Order by MOR PPM Inc(Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Agreed Protective Order
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Elisabeth Webb Howard on behalf of All Defendants (Howard, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Thu 10/31 2:12 PM
ORDER granting29 motion to intervene. Orion may file its objection to the writ of execution within 14 days of the entry of this Order. PPM shall have 14 days to respond to Orion's objection. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/31/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
30 30 respoth Answer to Writ of Garnishment Wed 10/30 2:28 PM
ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment filed by Simmons Bank. (fjg)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Intervene Wed 10/30 10:37 AM
MOTION to Intervene filed by Orion Energy Partners Investment Agent LLC. (fjg)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/30 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey B. Treece on behalf of Orion Energy Partners Investment Agent LLC. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
27 27 order Writ Issued Fri 10/25 2:13 PM
WRIT of Garnishment issued to Drax BioMass Inc by MOR PPM Inc. (fjg)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Writ Issued Fri 10/25 2:13 PM
WRIT of Garnishment issued to Pinnacle Mountain Holding Company V LLC by MOR PPM Inc. (fjg)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Writ Issued Fri 10/25 2:13 PM
WRIT of Garnishment issued to Simmons Bank by MOR PPM Inc. (fjg)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Writ Issued Fri 10/25 2:13 PM
WRIT of Garnishment issued to Citibank NA by MOR PPM Inc. (fjg)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Writ Issued Fri 10/25 2:12 PM
WRIT of Execution by MOR PPM Inc issued. (fjg)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Writ of Garnishment Fri 10/25 8:23 AM
Application for Writ of Garnishment and Execution by MOR PPM Inc(Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Execution,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Garnishment Citi Bank,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Garnishment Simmons Bank,
Att: 4 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Garnishment Pinnacle Mountain Holdings,
Att: 5 Exhibit Proposed Writ of Garnishment Drax Biomass, Inc.
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
21 21 motion Alter Judgment Tue 10/22 9:24 AM
MOTION to Alter Judgment OR AMEND JUDGMENT TO INCLUDE POST-AWARD, PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST by MOR PPM Inc (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Judgment Tue 09/24 11:03 AM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the19 Order entered this date plaintiff MOR PPM, Inc.'s1 application to confirm arbitration award is granted. Defendant Highland Pellets, LLC's11 cross-motion to vacate arbitration award is denied. Judgment is entered in favor of MOR PPM, Inc. in the amount of $10,097,666.98, together with post-judgment interest at the rate of 3.95 per annum from the date of the Judgment until paid. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/24/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
19 19 10 pgs order Order Tue 09/24 10:56 AM
ORDER granting1 application to confirm arbitration award; and denying11 cross-motion to vacate arbitration award. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/24/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/09 2:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Vacate1 Complaint filed by Highland Pellets LLC.(Finch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 01/31 8:50 AM
ORDER granting15 motion for leave to file a reply to MOR PPM's response to motion to vacate arbitration award; and allowing Highland ten days from the date of this Order to file its reply to plaintiff MOR PPM's response to the motion to vacate the arbitration award. Signed by Chief Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/31/2024. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/26 11:53 AM
NOTICE by MOR PPM Inc re15 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to MOR PPM, Inc.'s Response to Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Tue 11/21 2:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply to MOR PPM, Inc.'s Response to Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award by All Defendants (Finch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/20 6:09 AM
NOTICE by MOR PPM Inc Letter to Court (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
13 13 10 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 11/16 10:35 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Vacate1 Complaint filed by MOR PPM Inc.(Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit Ex. 1,
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit Ex. 2,
Att: 3 2 pgs Ex. 3
Friday, November 03, 2023
12 12 25 pgs brief Brief in Support Fri 11/03 5:39 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re11 Motion to Vacate,, filed by All Defendants. (Finch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 6 pgs motion Vacate Fri 11/03 5:36 PM
MOTION to Vacate1 Complaint by All Defendants(Finch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Declaration of James Warnot,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 25 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 70 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 7 pgs Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 10/17 4:13 PM
ORDER granting9 joint motion for extension of time; and denying as moot6 joint motion for the issuance of briefing schedule and extension of time. Highland shall have up to, and including, 11/4/2023, to respond to the Application and to file a motion to vacate, modify, or correct the award should it choose to do so. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/17/2023. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 10/16 12:33 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiff's Application to Confirm Arbitration Award and Submit Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award, IF ANY by All Defendants (Finch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/10 12:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION for Issuance of Briefing Schedule and Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Application to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by MOR PPM Inc. (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Deficiency Letter Tue 10/10 9:23 AM
Deficiency Letter notifying party that6 Motion for Extension of Time does not indicate opposing counsel was contacted. See Local Rule 6.2(b). (kbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
6 6 motion Issuance Mon 10/09 5:01 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Briefing Schedule and Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by All Defendants (Finch, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Fri 10/06 12:43 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by MOR PPM Inc (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
4 4 misc Deficiency Letter Thu 10/05 9:31 AM
Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re1 Application, notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
3 3 misc Affidavit Wed 10/04 12:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT Of Service by MOR PPM Inc. (Baxter, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
2 2 brief Brief in Support Tue 10/03 3:20 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT of1 Application to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by MOR PPM Inc. (llg)
Related: [-]
1 1 93 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 3:18 PM
APPLICATION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD against Highland Pellets LLC filed by MOR PPM Inc. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT3782.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)
Related: [-]