Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Joe J Volpe
Case #: 4:23-mc-00008
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2023
Terminated:Oct 06, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 06, 2023
4 4 3 pgs order Order Fri 10/06 2:44 PM
INSPECTION WARRANT re1 Request filed by Department of Labor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/6/2023. (cmn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/06 2:40 PM
REQUEST for Inspection Warrant and AFFIDAVIT of Jose M. Santos Turull. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/6/2023. (cmn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
2 2 misc Affidavit Tue 10/03 12:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Jose M. Santos Turull re1 Request. (cmn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/03 12:21 PM
REQUEST for Inspection Warrant Under The Occupational Safety and Health Act of 1970 filed by Department of Labor against 178 Archer Road, Dennard, Arkansas 72629.(cmn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet