Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Case #: 5:23-cv-01943
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2023
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 01, 2024 11:02 AM EDT
Defendant
J.M. Smucker Company
Represented By
Joshua E. Pittman
Jones Day - Columubs
contact info
Jonathan M. Linas
Jones Day - Chicago
contact info
Courtney L. Burks
Jones Day - Minneapolis
contact info
Defendant
Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC
550 Maryland Way Suite 120
Brentwood, TN 37027
Represented By
Zachary M. Swisher
Sybert Rhoad Lackey Swisher
contact info
Plaintiff
Rebecca Harbaugh
3265 Ruby Avenue NW
Massillon, OH 44647
Represented By
Robert E. Soles, Jr.
Law Office Of Robert E. Soles, Jr.
contact info
Faith R. Dylewski
Law Office Of Robert E. Soles, Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
38 38 order Stipulation & Order Tue 10/29 9:00 AM
Stipulation & Order approving the parties'37 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/28/2024. (D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
37 37 notice Stipulation (atty event) Mon 10/28 11:57 AM
Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC. (Swisher, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 10/01 5:52 PM
Order of Dismissal The Court was informed by the Non-document Minutes of Proceedings dated 10/1/2024 that the parties settled this case at a mediation conference conducted by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Therefore, the docket shall be marked "settled and dismissed without prejudice." On or before 10/31/2024, the parties shall submit a proposed and executed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, which, if approved, shall supersede this Order. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/1/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
minutes Mediation Conference ~Util - Terminate Referral Tue 10/01 2:15 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Mediation Conference held on 10/1/2024. Parties reached an agreement. Defendant to provide draft settlement agreement to Plaintiff by October 4, 2024. Final, executed settlement agreement to be completed by October 18, 2024. Time: 4 hours and 40 minutes. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
35 35 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 09/30 8:33 PM
Joint Notice of the Parties Regarding Stipulations Pursuant to Doc. #16 filed by Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC. (Swisher, Zachary)
Related: [-]
minutes Mediation Conference Mon 09/30 2:54 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Mediation Conference held on 9/30/2024. Parties to reconvene tomorrow, 10/1/2024, at 09:30 AM via video conference (Youngstown) before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 4 hours and 30 minutes. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 09/17 9:59 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] resetting mediation conference to resume on 9/30/2024 at 10:00 AM via video conference (Youngstown) before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Mon 09/16 2:41 PM
Order [non-document] granting in part the parties'34 Joint Motion for Extension of the Time Frame in which to File Dispositive Motions. The date for filing dispositive motions is extended until 10/7/2024. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/16/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
34 34 motion Extension (of deadlines) Thu 09/12 12:05 PM
Motion for extension of TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS until 30 DAYS FROM OUTCOME OF MEDIATION filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Harbaugh. (Dylewski, Faith)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Mon 09/09 11:26 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of with mediation conference to resume on 9/17/2024 at 10:00 AM via video conference (Youngstown) before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
minutes Mediation Conference Wed 08/28 2:43 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Second Mediation Conference held on 8/28/2024 via Zoom. Parties need a additional information to continue. Information to be received by end of business on Friday. The court will meet with the parties after that time to determine whether and how to best proceed with mediation. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 4 hours and 30 minutes. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference MJ Wed 08/28 2:37 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Pre-Mediation Telephone Conferences held on 8/27/2024. Attorney Faith Dylewski present on behalf of the Plaintiff. Attorney Zachary Swisher present on behalf of the Defendant. Parties discussed their upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 1 hour and 10 minutes. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
order Order on Motion for conference Mon 08/12 9:43 AM
Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to Conduct Mediation Via Zoom Related [+]. The court will provide Plaintiff and Defense counsel with instructions via email for connecting to the video conference. Counsel shall provide these instructions to their parties/party representatives so that all required participants are connected to the conference. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 8/12/2024.(D,I)
Related: [-] 33
Friday, August 09, 2024
33 33 motion Conference/Hearing Fri 08/09 12:46 PM
Joint Motion for conference/hearing Conduct Mediation Via Zoom filed by Defendant Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC. (Swisher, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
32 32 minutes ~Util - Terminate Referral Order Tue 07/30 2:11 PM
Order: This matter was referred to the undersigned to resolve a discovery dispute raised by Defendant Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC in ECF No.30 . On July 29, 2024, the Court instructed the parties to meet and confer regarding the dispute and update the Court via electronic mail by noon on July 30, 2024 regarding the status of the meet and confer. Specifically, the Court instructed the parties to provide their availability on or before August 9, 2024, for the deposition. Counsel for Defendant Premise explained that he is unavailable until after August 23, 2024, due to a three-week-long trial in a criminal matter scheduled to begin on August 5, 2024. Plaintiff did not respond to the Court's request. Accordingly, the deposition noticed for August 9, 2024 is canceled by Order of the court. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 7/30/2024. Related [+] (S,KL)
Related: [-] ument31
Monday, July 29, 2024
31 31 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Mon 07/29 4:18 PM
Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendant Premise Health Employer Solutions LLC's Motion for Protective Order (ECF No.30 ) is denied without prejudice to refiling, if circumstances require. The parties' discovery dispute set forth in ECF No.30 , however, is hereby referred to the Honorable Carmen E. Henderson, United States Magistrate Judge, for resolution pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and Local Rules 72.1 and 72.2(a). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/29/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 28, 2024
30 30 motion Protective Order Sun 07/28 1:14 PM
Motion for protective order regarding deposition notice filed by Defendant Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC. (Swisher, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
29 29 5 pgs order Order Wed 07/17 4:27 PM
Order setting second mediation conference to be held on 8/28/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 242 before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Additionally, a Telephone Conference with Plaintiff's Counsel is set for 8/27/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. A Telephone Conference with Defense Counsel is set for 8/27/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. The court will host the conference calls and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the call. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 7/17/2024. Related [+](S,KL)
Related: [-] ument18
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Wed 07/10 6:33 PM
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson to conduct another Mediation/Settlement conference to be completed by not later than 9/13/2024, if possible. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/10/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Wed 07/10 6:29 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Telephonic Status Conference held on 7/10/2024. Present were Attorney Faith R. Dylewski as counsel for Plaintiff; Attorney Zachary M. Swisher as counsel for Defendant Premise Health Employer Solutions LLC ("Premise"); Plaintiff Rebecca Harbaugh; and, Attorney Lane Patterson as party representative for Premise. The remaining parties and their lead counsel of record expressed an interest in revisiting the settlement discussions that occurred in May 2024 during and after the Mediation Conference. An Order referring the parties to Magistrate Judge Henderson for additional mediation will issue. (Court Reporter: None); Time: 34 Minutes. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
27 27 order Protective Order Mon 07/08 11:15 AM
Stipulated Protective Order regarding confidential documents. See Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures Manual at Sections 19 and 24 for filing documents under seal. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/8/2024. Related document(s)20 . (JLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for judgment on the pleadings Order on Motion to dismiss party Fri 05/17 3:54 PM
Order For good cause shown, Plaintiff Rebecca Harbaugh's Unopposed Rule 21 Motion to Dismiss Defendant The J. M. Smucker Company ("Smucker") With Prejudice (ECF No.25 ) is granted. Smucker is dropped as a party defendant with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 for the reasons stated in the unopposed motion. Each party to bear their own costs. The claims against Defendant Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC ("Premise") remain pending. Smucker's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No.22 ) is denied as moot. Counsel for Plaintiff and Premise are reminded that this case is set for a Telephonic Status Conference on 7/10/2024 at 11:00 a.m. See Case Management Plan (ECF No.16 ). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/17/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Party Mon 05/13 5:02 PM
Motion to dismiss party The J.M. Smucker Company filed by Plaintiff Rebecca Harbaugh. (Dylewski, Faith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
minutes Mediation Conference ~Util - Terminate Referral Thu 05/09 2:17 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Mediation Conference held on 5/7/2024. After extensive negotiations, the parties did not reach a settlement. Referral Terminated. Time: 4 hours and 30 minutes. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference MJ Mon 05/06 3:13 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Pre-Mediation Telephone Conferences held on 5/6/2024. Attorney Faith R. Dylewski present on behalf of the Plaintiff. Attorney Zachary M. Swisher present on behalf of Defendant Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC. Attorney Courtney L. Burks present on behalf of Defendant J.M. Smucker Company. Parties discussed their upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 1 hour and 30 minutes. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Wed 05/01 12:32 PM
Order For the reasons set forth herein, Defendants' Joint and Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time to Conduct Mediation Conference (ECF No.23 ) is denied. If Smucker wanted a halt, it should have filed ECF No.22 sooner. The mediation conference will be conducted on 5/7/2024 at 10:00 a.m., unless Magistrate Judge Henderson needs to reset it. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 5/1/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
23 23 motion Extension (of deadlines) Fri 04/26 3:40 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of Mediation filed by J.M. Smucker Company, Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC. (Burks, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
22 22 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Fri 04/19 5:05 PM
Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Defendant J.M. Smucker Company.(Burks, Courtney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Service Agreement),
Att: 3 Exhibit B (EEOC Inquiry)
Thursday, February 29, 2024
21 21 order Stipulation & Order Thu 02/29 10:39 AM
Stipulation and Order approving the parties'19 Proposed Stipulation Regarding Inadvertent Disclosure of Attorney-Client Privilege, Work Product Protection, or Other Applicable Privilege. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/29/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
20 20 notice Stipulation (atty event) Wed 02/28 3:59 PM
Proposed Stipulation Protective Order filed by Rebecca Harbaugh. (Dylewski, Faith)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Stipulation (atty event) Wed 02/28 3:51 PM
Proposed Stipulation Regarding Inadvertent Disclosure of Attorney-Client Priviliege filed by Rebecca Harbaugh. (Dylewski, Faith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
18 18 6 pgs order Order Tue 02/20 11:03 AM
Order setting mediation conference to be held on 5/7/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. Additionally, a Telephone Conference with Plaintiff's Counsel is set for 5/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. A Telephone Conference with Defense Counsel for Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC is set for 5/6/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. A Telephone Conference with Defense Counsel for J.M. Smucker Company is set for 5/6/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. The court will host the conference calls and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the call. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements prior to the mediation conference. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 2/20/2024. (S,KL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 18, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Sun 02/18 12:40 PM
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson to conduct a Mediation/Settlement to be completed by not later than 5/14/2024, if possible. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/18/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Sun 02/18 12:38 PM
Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track, and is referred to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson to conduct a mediation. The parties do not consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed on or before 8/9/2024. On or before 6/10/2024, the party that has the burden of proof on an issue(s) shall identify its retained expert witness(es) and provide opposing counsel with a written expert report(s). The party that has no burden of proof on an issue(s) shall identify its retained expert(s), if any, and submit an opposing written report(s) to opposing counsel on or before 7/10/2024. The discovery deposition of an opponent's expert witness shall be completed on or before 8/9/2024. Counsel shall comply with LR 37.1, which outlines a process for resolution of discovery disputes. On or before 2/28/2024, the parties shall file either the attached Stipulation (Attachment No. 1) or a stipulation reached by the parties regarding the handling of trial-preparation material. The cutoff for filing dispositive motions 9/30/2024, with responses filed by 10/30/2024, and replies by 11/13/2024. Written stipulations as to all uncontested facts to be presented by the dispositive motion shall be filed with the Court on or before 9/30/2024. f there are no stipulations, a joint notice stating same shall be filed by the same date. These are mandatory requirements. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/10/2024 at 11:00 a.m. Attorney Dylewsk is to set up the conference call by joining the other participants and calling the Court at (330) 884-7435. Parties' attendance is welcome, but not mandatory. Counsel should notify the Court in advance of a Status Conference if the matter has settled. The parties shall file a proposed Stipulated Protective Order on or before 2/28/2024. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/18/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
minutes Case Management Conference Wed 02/14 5:30 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2024. Present were Attorney Faith R. Dylewski as counsel for Plaintiff; Attorney Zachary M. Swisher as counsel for Defendant Premise Health Employer Solutions LLC ("Premise"); Attorney Jonathan M. Linas as counsel for Defendant The J. M. Smucker Company ("Smucker"); Plaintiff Rebecca Harbaugh; Attorney Lane Patterson Summers as party representative for Premise; and, Attorney Lisa Whittaker as party representative for Smucker. (Court Reporter: None); Time: 53 Minutes. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
15 15 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 02/08 2:22 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by Rebecca Harbaugh. (Dylewski, Faith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Tue 01/09 1:51 PM
Order granting12 ,13 Motions for Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Attorneys Jonathan M. Linas and Courtney L. Burks for Defendant J.M. Smucker Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/9/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/08 6:37 PM
Motion for attorney Courtney L. Burks to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12347577, filed by Defendant J.M. Smucker Company.(Pittman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/08 6:35 PM
Motion for attorney Jonathan M. Linas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12347572, filed by Defendant J.M. Smucker Company.(Pittman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/08 6:31 PM
Answer to1 Complaint,,,, filed by J.M. Smucker Company. (Pittman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 01/08 6:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by J.M. Smucker Company. (Pittman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 01/08 6:25 PM
Attorney Appearance by Joshua E. Pittman filed by on behalf of J.M. Smucker Company. (Pittman, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
8 8 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 2:51 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Telephonic Case Management Conference to be held on 2/14/2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at (330) 884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/5/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment No. 1,
Att: 2 Attachment No. 2,
Att: 3 Attachment No. 3,
Att: 4 Attachment No. 4,
Att: 5 Attachment No. 5
7 7 7 pgs order Order Fri 01/05 2:45 PM
Initial Discovery Protocols Order . Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/5/2024. (JLG)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 01/05 3:08 PM
Copy of7 Initial Discovery Protocols Order and8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order mailed to Molly M. Dengler, Esq., Jones Day, 150 West Jefferson, Suite 2100, Detroit, MI 48226-4438, counsel for Defendant J.M. Smucker Company, on 1/5/2024. Related document(s)7 ,8 . (JLG)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/29 4:23 PM
Answer to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC. (Swisher, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/07 3:59 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Rebecca Harbaugh. Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 10/19/2023, answer due 12/18/2023 filed on behalf of Rebecca Harbaugh (Dylewski, Faith)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 12/07 3:55 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Rebecca Harbaugh. J.M. Smucker Company waiver sent on 11/13/2023, answer due 1/12/2024 filed on behalf of Rebecca Harbaugh (Dylewski, Faith)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
3 3 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Fri 10/27 1:13 PM
Attorney Appearance by Zachary M. Swisher filed by on behalf of Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC. (Swisher, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 10/04 3:10 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC., (and Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC., c/o CT Corporation); The J.M. Smucker Company (and The J.M. Smucker Company, c/o CT Corporation). (G,M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 10/04 2:31 PM
Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-12212084. Filed by Rebecca Harbaugh. (Dylewski, Faith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Smucker's COVID-19 Mandatory Vaccination Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - November 5, 2021 Smucker's Vaccine Mandate and Team Member Impact E-mail,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - December 9, 2021 from Rebecca Risher to Harbaugh,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Harbaugh's Religious Exemption Request,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - February 11, 2022 E-mail from October Riggenbach to Harbaugh,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - December 21, 2022 E-mail from Cara Sigel,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - March 23, 2022 E-mail Re. Health Center Group Manager Application,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Smucker COVID-19 Vaccination Attestation,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Right to Sue Notice - Premise,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Right to Sue Notice - Smucker,
Att: 12 Summons- Premise,
Att: 13 Summons- Premise Statutory,
Att: 14 Summons- Smucker,
Att: 15 Summons- Smucker Statutory
utility Add and Terminate Judge Wed 10/04 2:59 PM
Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (G,M)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Wed 10/04 2:59 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (G,M)
Related: [-]