Idaho District Court
Judge:Candy W Dale
Case #: 1:23-cv-00437
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 1:47 AM MST
Defendant
Boise School District
Defendant
Fairmont Junior High
Defendant
Christopher Ryan
Plaintiff
C H
Represented By
Andrea J Rosholt
Rosholt Law PLLC
contact info
Eric S Rossman
Rossman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Aaron Hummel
Represented By
Andrea J Rosholt
Rosholt Law PLLC
contact info
Eric S Rossman
Rossman Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Hummel
Represented By
Andrea J Rosholt
Rosholt Law PLLC
contact info
Eric S Rossman
Rossman Law Group PLLC
contact info

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, December 08, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline Fri 12/08 8:33 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Boise School District, Fairmont Junior High, C H, Aaron Hummel, Amy Hummel, Christopher Ryan re6 Notice of Appearance,1 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 2/6/2024. (hs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/07 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Sullivan Magnelli on behalf of All Defendants (Magnelli, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
5 5 order Litigation Order Wed 11/29 1:19 PM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2023 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. On or before December 12, 2023, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 11/29 12:04 PM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall reassign this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Candy W. Dale the judge assigned to the earlier filed of the related cases for all future proceedings. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (hs)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 11/29 12:08 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale for all further proceedings. US Magistrate Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please use case number 1:23-cv-437-CWD on all future pleadings. (hs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/25 10:12 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aaron Hummel, C H, Amy Hummel. All Defendants.(Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Waiver of Service of Summons-Fairmont Junior High,
Att: 2 Waiver of Service of Summons-Christopher Ryan
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 10/10 10:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Boise School District, Fairmont Junior High, Christopher Ryan. (Print attached Summons for service.) (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Fairmont,
Att: 2 Summons Ryan
Friday, October 06, 2023
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/06 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2640627.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Rossman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Boise School District,
Att: 2 Summons Fairmont Junior High,
Att: 3 Summons Christopher Ryan,
Att: 4 Cover Sheet