Ulses v. Chemguard, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-04959 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 04, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 4:23-cv-01165 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 01, 2024 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
|
|
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Plaintiff
Marc Ulses
Steven A. Donner 906 Olive Street Suite 1110
St. Louis, MO 63101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 10/12 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 10/06 3:01 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Missouri Eastern (associated as of 10/4/2023), 4:23-cv-01165, Ulses v. Chemguard, Inc. et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-04959-RMG NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at link at the end of this NOTICE). CMO Nos. 1 - 27, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Monthly Status Conference TBD. See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 10/06 2:56 PM
Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:23-cv-01165. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of South Carolina. Signed by Tiffaney Pete on 10/3/2023. Case transferred via CM-ECF extraction. (JBH) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/6/2023.] | |
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-153) regarding MDL 2873 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Tiffaney Pete on 10/3/2023. (JBH) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/6/2023.] | |
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Petition Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Marc Ulses.(JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/6/2023.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP Sent To: Plaintiff(Beasley, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/6/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Removal | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 23SL-CC03822, with receipt number AMOEDC-10166472, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Beasley, Laura) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/6/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit St. Louis County Docket Sheet | ||
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Joseph S. Dueker. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 10/6/2023.] |