New York Southern District Court
Judge:Dale E Ho
Case #: 1:23-cv-08864
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Terminated:Jun 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Reuters America LLC
Represented By
Catherine Seibel
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Ballard Spahr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Reuters News & Media Inc.
Represented By
Catherine Seibel
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Thomas Byrne Sullivan
Ballard Spahr Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Rafael Marchante
Represented By
Pamela A. Markert
Cera LLP
contact info
Solomon B. Cera
Cera LLP
contact info
James Henry Bartolomei, III
James H. Bartolomei, Iii PA
contact info
Bryan Daniel Hoben
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 08, 2024
73 73 order Stipulation and Order Mon 07/08 3:24 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that, subject to the Court's approval, dismissal of this case pursuant to the doctrine of forum non conveniens as reflected in the Opinion and Order at Dkt. 66 shall be on the condition that Defendants agree to: Waive any statute of limitations defense that may have arisen since the filing of this action as further set forth in this Order. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that if the Opinion and Order is amended as outlined above, Plaintiff and Defendants agree to these conditions; IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that if the Opinion and Order is amended as outlined above, Plaintiff will not move for reconsideration of, or file an appeal in connection with, the Opinion and Order; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that Plaintiff shall agree to appear in the Current Spanish Action within 60 days of the date this Stipulation and Order is entered without requiring further formal service of process. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 7/8/2024) (ks)
Related: [-]
72 72 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Mon 07/08 12:04 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Rafael Marchante..(Bartolomei, James)
Related: [-]