Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:23-cv-23851
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2023
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Case in other court:11th Judicial Circuit Court for Miami-Dade County, 23-022763-CA-01
Last checked: Sunday Apr 07, 2024 5:21 PM EDT
Defendant
Police Chief Delma Noel-Pratt
Represented By
Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper & Hochman PA
contact info
Jonathan Howard Railey
Johnson, Anselmo, Murdoch, Burke, Piper & Hochman, PA
contact info
Defendant
City of Miami Gardens
Represented By
Christopher J. Stearns, Jr.
Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper & Hochman PA
contact info
Jonathan Howard Railey
Johnson, Anselmo, Murdoch, Burke, Piper & Hochman, PA
contact info
Mediator
Steven R. Jaffe
Plaintiff
Dr. Robin Starks
Represented By
Michael A. Pizzi
Michael A Pizzi, Jr., P.A.
contact info
Benedict P. Kuehne
Kuehne Davis Law, P.A.
contact info
Johan Daniel Dos Santos
Kuehne Davis Law P.A.
contact info
Stephan Lopez
Stephan Lopez Law Firm LLC
contact info

GPO May 24 2024
OMNIBUS ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS: ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint consistent with this Order on or before June 7, 2024. Amended Complaint due by 6/7/2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, October 31, 2024
71 71 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 11/01 12:11 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re70 Transmittal Letter Sent. (amb)
Related: [-]