Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Referred: Christopher C Bly
Case #: 1:23-cv-04600
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Race Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 06, 2024 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
Americredit Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By
Dominique Saint-Fort
Littler Mendelson Pc -Atl
contact info
Bradley E. Strawn
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
John Tolbert
Represented By
Robert R. Parker, Jr
Robert R. Parker Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 31 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Thu 04/24 8:42 AM
RETURN of46 APPLICATION for Admission of Robert L. Parker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number BGANDC-14224723) to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant's name listed when e-filing does not match name listed on the application. Please correct and resubmit. (jas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
46 46 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/15 10:48 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Robert L. Parker Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number BGANDC-14224723).by John Tolbert. (Harvey, Bruce)
Related: [-]
45 45 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 10:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce S. Harvey on behalf of John Tolbert (Harvey, Bruce)
Related: [-]
44 44 motion Miscellaneous Relief Reconsideration Tue 04/15 2:10 AM
First MOTION to Reconsider and Reinstate Plaintiff's Counsel re38 Order to Show Cause,40 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,42 Order,41 Response in Opposition to Motion by John Tolbert. (Parker, Robert) Modified docket text on 4/15/2025 (cpp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 04/09 4:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Strawn, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
42 42 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Tue 04/01 2:48 PM
ORDER. The Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to terminate Robert R. Parker, Jr., as counsel for Plaintiff. Under Local Rule 83.1, Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide notice to the Clerk, within 21 days of the date of this order, of the appointment of replacement counsel or of his intention to proceed pro se, without the benefit of counsel. Mr. Parker is ORDERED to serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff at his last known address. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Mr. Parker via the mail and email addresses appearing on the docket. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to submit this matter to the undersigned upon receipt of Plaintiff's notice of replacement counsel or of his intention to proceed pro se, or upon the expiration of the time to provide such notice. Attorney Robert R. Parker, Jr. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 4/1/2025. (cpp)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/01 10:54 AM
Submission of40 Order to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (bnp)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/01 3:06 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re42 Order as to attorney Robert R. Parker. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
41 41 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/28 7:26 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to34 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by John Tolbert. (Parker, Robert) Modified on 3/28/2025 to edit docket text. (jtj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/27 9:20 AM
Submission of34 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 03/20 9:13 AM
Submission of40 Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
40 40 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/05 1:26 PM
ORDER. Mr. Parker SHALL file a well-supported application to proceed pro hac vice within 14 DAYS of the entry of this Order. The motion for extension of time to file a response to the motion for summary judgment, Dkt. No.39 , is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall have 21 DAYS from the entry of this Order to file his response. Failure to timely file the pro hac vice application will result in the immediate termination of Robert R. Parker, Jr., as counsel for Plaintiff. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Mr. Parker via the mail and email addresses appearing on the docket and to resubmit this matter to the undersigned 15 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/5/2025. (cpp)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 03/05 9:02 AM
Submission of38 Order to Show Cause to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
39 39 motion Extension of Time Tue 02/25 11:41 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Defendant's MSJ by John Tolbert. (Parker, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 02/21 9:30 AM
Submission of34 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 02/18 11:44 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is ORDERED that attorney Robert R. Parker, Jr., SHOW CAUSE within 14 days of the entry of this Order why he should not be terminated from this case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Mr. Parker via the mail and email addresses appearing on the docket. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/18/2025. (cpp)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/18 11:49 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robert R. Parker, Jr. re38 Order. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 02/10 8:50 AM
Submission of37 Order to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 01/24 2:14 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion to extend completion of pro hac vice application; granting32 Motion to extend completion of pro hac vice application. Plaintiff shall have 14 days from the entry of this Order to file the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/24/2025. (cpp)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Letter re:83.1 Fri 01/24 10:29 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Robert R. Parker, Jr.. Clerk to follow-up by 2/3/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
35 35 notice Notice of Filing Thu 01/16 8:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing John Tolbert Deposition Transcript by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.(Strawn, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit John Tolbert Deposition Transcript
34 34 motion Summary Judgment Thu 01/16 8:04 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Strawn, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Statement of Material Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Gravitt Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of John Tolbert Deposition,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Incident Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Daniel's Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 - GMF Investigations Report,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 - Final Written Warning,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 - Performance Improvement Plan,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 - HR Intake Form,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 - Email from Justin Daniels,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10 - Glisson Declaration,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11 - Gillespie Declaration,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12 - Charge of Discrimination
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 01/15 7:31 AM
Submission of31 Motion for Extension of Time,32 First MOTION for Extension of Time File Pro Hac Vice Application and Order , to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/30 11:26 AM
ORDER: Defendant's30 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Time is GRANTED. The Court hereby extends the deadline for Defendant to file its Motion for Summary Judgment through and including, January 16, 2025. Plaintiff shall have until February 20, 2025, to file a Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/30/2024. (tcc) Modified on 12/30/2024 (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Mon 12/30 3:49 PM
Notification of Docket Correction re31 Motion for Extension of Time. Corrected event. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 28, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time Sat 12/28 7:17 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time File Pro Hac Vice Application and Order with Brief In Support by John Tolbert. (Parker, Robert)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Sat 12/28 7:15 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by John Tolbert. (Parker, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
30 30 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/27 4:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Strawn, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/27 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colby J Ellis on behalf of Americredit Financial Services, Inc. (Ellis, Colby)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Mon 10/21 1:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving Notice to Take the Deposition of John Tolbert by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
order Order to Extend Time for Discovery Fri 10/18 11:58 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed the joint status report and GRANTS the request to extend the time to complete discovery. Discovery will close on December 2, 2024, and dispositive motions shall be filed by January 2, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/18/2024. (jtj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
26 26 misc Status Report Thu 10/17 5:17 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 12, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 09/13 11:22 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Stay. The case is STAYED through the mediation and for 10 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 09/12/2024. (tht)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stay Thu 09/12 3:44 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay to Attend Private Mediation with Brief In Support by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, July 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 07/26 9:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS22 the Parties' joint motion for extension of time to complete discovery. Discovery closes on September 16, 2024, and dispositive motions shall be filed by October 16, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 7/25/2024. (jtj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 07/25 4:42 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2024
21 21 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 07/01 3:50 PM
Consent Protective Order Governing Protection and Production of Confidential Information, Documents, and Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 07/01/2024. (tht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A - Acknowledgment and Agreement to be bound
Thursday, June 20, 2024
20 20 motion Protective Order Thu 06/20 10:45 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order Governing Protection and Production of Confidential Information, Documents and Materials with Brief In Support by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Mon 06/10 4:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
18 18 discov Certificate of Service Mon 06/10 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Continuing Interrogatories by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 06/07 8:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS16 the Parties' joint motion for extension of time to complete discovery. Discovery shall close on August 1, 2024, and dispositive motions shall be filed by September 3, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 6/7/2024. (jtj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 06/06 5:27 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/09 9:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS14 the Parties' joint motion for extension of time to complete discovery. Discovery will close on June 17, 2024, and dispositive motions shall be filed by July 17, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on April 9, 2024. (jtj)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 04/08 6:06 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Brief In Support by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 29, 2024
13 13 discov Certificate of Service Mon 01/29 2:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Certificate of Service Mon 01/29 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Mon 01/29 2:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE serving Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
10 10 4 pgs order Order Tue 12/26 11:04 AM
ORDER MODIFYING LOCAL RULES REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/26/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/26 10:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery in this case shall close on April 18, 2024. The parties shall file motions for summary judgment by May 20, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/26/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
8 8 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 12/20 8:40 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/20 6:21 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Americredit Financial Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Financial Company, Inc. for Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. (Strawn, Bradley)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/20 4:33 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by Americredit Financial Services, Inc.. Discovery ends on 4/18/2024.(Strawn, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 11/06 8:55 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be extended to November 21, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/06/2023. (tht)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 11/03 4:37 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief In Support by Americredit Financial Services, Inc..(Strawn, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/03 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dominique Saint-Fort on behalf of Americredit Financial Services, Inc. (Saint-Fort, Dominique)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 10/10 12:03 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Americredit Financial Services, Inc. (ces)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2023
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/10 12:02 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by John Tolbert. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12936930)(ces)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet