Rhode Island District Court
Judge:William E Smith
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:23-cv-00416
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 4:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Karen Bloom
Represented By
John B. Moretta
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By
John B. Moretta
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Rita Ellen Roach
Represented By
Richard A. Sinapi
Sinapi Law Associates, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 71 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
order Order Wed 05/29 3:35 PM
TEXT ORDER entering9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/29/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 05/13 12:58 PM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Moretta, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 02/23 4:29 PM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion to Stay. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/23/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
8 8 motion Stay Tue 01/30 11:31 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 2/13/2024. (Moretta, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/26 11:54 AM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Karen Bloom answer due 2/2/2024; CVS Pharmacy, Inc. answer due 2/2/2024. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/26/2023. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/22 1:48 PM
Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Response to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Karen Bloom, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. Responses due by 1/5/2024. (Moretta, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/22 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Moretta on behalf of Karen Bloom, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Moretta, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 12/20 2:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Ellen Roach. Karen Bloom served on 12/20/2023, answer due 1/10/2024. (Sinapi, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/18 5:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rita Ellen Roach. CVS Pharmacy, Inc. served on 12/12/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Sinapi, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 10/11 3:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Karen Bloom, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Wed 10/11 3:16 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint - New Case Wed 10/11 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1918978 ), filed by Rita Ellen Roach.(Sinapi, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Issued - CVS,
Att: 3 Summons Issued - Karen Bloom
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 10/11 3:15 PM
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]