California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:23-cv-08584
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 11, 2023
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 08, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
County of Los Angeles
Represented By
Laura Inlow
Collinson Daehnke Inlow And Greco
contact info
Lenore Cabreros Kelly
Collinson Daehnke Inlow And Greco
contact info
Defendant
Doe LASD Deputies
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department
Represented By
Laura Inlow
Collinson Daehnke Inlow And Greco
contact info
Lenore Cabreros Kelly
Collinson Daehnke Inlow And Greco
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard T. Copeland
Represented By
Richard T Copeland
Conflict Solution Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Annie Vicente Jump
Represented By
Edwin Stuart Salguero
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras, PLC
contact info
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Annie Jump Vicente
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 06, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/06 1:44 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, re Stipulation27 : Based on the joint Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Case With Prejudice filed by the parties in this matter on May 2, 2024 (ECF 27), and good cause appearing therefor, it is hereby ordered that the entire case is dismissed with prejudice. All parties are to bear their own costs arising out of this dismissal. (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
27 27 stip Dismiss Case Thu 05/02 4:51 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department.(Inlow, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 01, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Sat 03/02 6:40 AM
ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT AND FILING OF DISMISSAL, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD25 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed and taken off calendar, thereby removing this case from the Court's active caseload. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal within 60 days (the"Dismissal Date") of this order. If no dismissal is filed, the Court deems the matter dismissed at that time. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
25 25 2 pgs notice Settlement Mon 02/26 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Annie Jump Vicente. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
24 24 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Fri 02/23 6:48 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-021) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, this case is transferred from Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr to the calendar of Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-08584 MRA(KSx). (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
23 23 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Fri 01/05 9:18 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard T. Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
22 22 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Fri 01/05 8:48 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Annie Jump Vicente (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
21 21 9 pgs order Order Fri 12/15 5:09 PM
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Fri 12/15 5:08 PM
PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/15 5:07 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: PLEASE READ THIS ORDER (AND ATTACHMENT) CAREFULLY: The post-settlement status conference is set for August 9, 2024 at 8:30 AM. The pretrial conference is set for October 4, 2024 at 10:00 AM. The jury trial is set for October 21, 2024 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DATES AND DEADLINES. (jgr)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Fri 12/15 5:04 PM
MINUTES OF Mandatory Scheduling Conference held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court hears from the parties about the contents of their joint Rule 26(f) report. A case management order shall be issued separately. Court Reporter: Myra Ponce. (jgr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
17 17 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 12/04 12:21 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff Annie Jump Vicente.. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 19, 2023
16 16 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Sun 11/19 4:33 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Annie Jump Vicente (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
15 15 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Wed 11/15 3:50 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on December 15, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by December 5, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 11/15 9:34 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department, (Inlow, Laura)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/15 9:29 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition10 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department.(Attorney Laura Inlow added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Inlow added to party Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department (pty:dft))(Inlow, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
12 12 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 10/17 10:50 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition10 as to Defendants County of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
11 11 notice Summons Request Mon 10/16 3:41 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition10 filed by Plaintiff Annie Jump Vicente. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
10 10 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 10/16 3:26 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Annie Jump Vicente (Attorney Christian M. Contreras added to party Annie Jump Vicente (pty:pla))(Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Sat 10/14 8:07 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 10/13 11:32 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants County of Los Angeles, Doe LASD Deputies, Los Angeles County Sheriffs Department. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 10/13 10:49 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 10/13 10:48 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 10/13 10:48 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 10/11 7:31 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Annie Vicente Jump. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 10/11 7:28 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Annie Vicente Jump, (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 10/11 7:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Annie Vicente Jump. (Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 10/11 7:21 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36205520 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Annie Vicente Jump. (Attorney Christian M. Contreras added to party Annie Vicente Jump(pty:pla))(Contreras, Christian)
Related: [-]