Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Jay C Zainey
Referred: Michael North
Case #: 2:23-cv-06179
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2023
Case in other court:17th JDC - Lafourche Parish, H-148264
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 4:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By
Amy Dunn Hotard
Salley, Hite, Mercer & Resor LLC
contact info
Stephen Charles Resor
Salley, Hite, Mercer & Resor LLC
contact info
John William Hite, III
Salley, Hite, Mercer & Resor LLC
contact info
Jordan T. Lacoste
Salley, Hite, Mercer & Resor LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Delaune
Represented By
Galen M. Hair
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC
contact info
Rene C. Gautreaux
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC
contact info
Ashley Unsworth Schmidt
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
19 19 21 pgs order Order Thu 01/16 10:09 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Fri 12/20 12:26 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDERED that defendant/insurers, through counsel, immediately determine whether any of their settled Hurricane Ida cases remain on the docket of this Court and immediately file a Notice of Settlement in said case so that it can be dismissed by the District Judge. This process shall be completed in no more than 21 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/18/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Continue Wed 10/16 1:45 PM
ORDER re:16 Motion to Continue. ORDERED:12 Motion for Summary Judgmentis dismissed without prejudice subject to be refiled when the parties have completed the necessary discovery. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/16/2024. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 motion Continue Tue 10/15 2:23 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue by Allstate Indemnity Company.(Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
15 15 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/10 1:21 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Rachel Delaune re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment.(Schmidt, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
14 14 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/09 1:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Affiant Ashley Schmidt re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Schmidt, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 10/08 6:43 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Rachel Delaune re12 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Schmidt, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
12 12 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/27 10:25 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Allstate Indemnity Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/16/2024.(Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission,
Att: 4 Exhibit Allstate Policy
Friday, June 21, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/21 2:18 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - ORDER re Motions to Compel and Payment of Mediation Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 06/17/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 05/09 2:15 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Clare E. Donovan, James L. Donovan, Jr for Allstate Indemnity Company. Attorney Jordan T. Lacoste; Stephen Charles Resor; John William Hite, III and Amy Dunn Hotard terminated. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/8/2024. (mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
9 9 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 05/07 5:19 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney James L. Donovan, Jr. and Clare Donovan to be substituted in place of Stephen Resor, Amy Hotard, John Hite, Jordan Lacoste by Allstate Indemnity Company.Attorney James L. Donovan, Jr added to party Allstate Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Donovan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
8 8 30+ pgs order Order Wed 12/27 9:51 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Mon 12/18 3:57 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Allstate Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Corporation, Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Indemnity Company Related [+]
Related: [-] sor, Stephen
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Mon 12/18 3:55 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal,, by Allstate Indemnity Company Related [+]
Related: [-] sor, Stephen
Thursday, November 02, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 11/02 2:55 PM
Notice of Compliance by Allstate Indemnity Company re1 Removal. Related [+]
Related: [-] sor, Stephen
Thursday, October 19, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/19 10:10 AM
DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Allstate Indemnity Company.(jls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Tue 10/17 5:33 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/14/2023.(jls)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Mon 10/16 9:59 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/13 3:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th JDC - Lafourche Parish, case number H-148264 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10217362) filed by Allstate Indemnity Company.Attorney Stephen Charles Resor added to party Allstate Indemnity Company(pty:dft) Related [+]
Related: [-] sor, Stephen
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State Court Petition,
Att: 3 Verification,
Att: 4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Affidavit,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet