King County v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-21178 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 16, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Washington Western, 2:23-cv-01390 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 13, 2024 4:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
The Cigna Group
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Evernorth Health Inc
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
KING COUNTY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 04/24 11:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., Evernorth Health Inc, Express Scripts Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., Optum Inc., Optumrx Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., The Cigna Group, UnitedHealth Group Inc, filed by KING COUNTY.(KO, DAVID) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 6:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LINDSAY on behalf of KING COUNTY (LINDSAY, ANDREW) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 01/18 12:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING COUNTY. Optum Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; Optumrx Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; UnitedHealth Group Inc waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 01/12 4:34 PM
NOTICE by KING COUNTY of withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice counsel (WRIGHT, EMMA) |
|
18 | 18
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 01/12 1:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING COUNTY. EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; Evernorth Health Inc waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; Express Scripts Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; The Cigna Group waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 01/10 5:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING COUNTY. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY waiver sent on 11/29/2023. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 12/19 7:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING COUNTY. SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 12/15 4:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING COUNTY. CAREMARK L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; CAREMARK RX L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024; CVS PHARMACY INC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 12/01 12:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KING COUNTY. NOVO NORDISK INC. waiver sent on 11/29/2023, answer due 1/29/2024. (KO, DAVID) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/07 9:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., Evernorth Health Inc, Express Scripts Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., NOVO NORDISK INC., Optum Inc., Optumrx Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Inc, filed by KING COUNTY.(KO, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/30 7:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DEREK W LOESER on behalf of KING COUNTY (LOESER, DEREK) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/27 6:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL C BOWANKO on behalf of KING COUNTY (BOWANKO, RACHEL) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/27 6:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EMMA MARGUERITE WRIGHT on behalf of KING COUNTY (WRIGHT, EMMA) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/27 6:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULI FARRIS on behalf of KING COUNTY (FARRIS, JULI) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/27 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LAURA R GERBER on behalf of KING COUNTY (GERBER, LAURA) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/27 6:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID J. KO on behalf of KING COUNTY (KO, DAVID) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Mon 10/16 12:39 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (krg, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Mon 10/16 12:33 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:23-cv-01390. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 10/16 12:35 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
order
Case Management Order
Mon 10/16 12:48 PM
This case is part of MDL 3080. Parties are expected to review and abide by all prior orders entered in this MDL, which can be found[LINK:here] . (krg, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Mon 10/16 12:49 PM
Member Case Direct File on 10/16/2023, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg, ) |
||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
Case Transferred out. Case will be sent to District of New Jersey. (MJV) | ||
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this matter to the Honorable Brian R. Martinotti in the District of New Jersey as tag-along action related to In Re: Insulin Pricing Litig., MDL No. 3080. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SB) | |
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in District of New Jersey, case number(s) in other court 2:23-md-03080 (BRM)(RLS); filed by Plaintiff King County. (SB) (Filing received via email 9/8/2023, during CM/ECF outage) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Email Receipt | ||
2 | 2 ** Reminder ** Documents omitted re1 Complaint. Notice of Pendency of Other Action. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (JWC) | |
Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (JWC) | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND Attorney Derek W Loeser added to party King County, Washington(pty:pla) filed by King County, Washington.(Loeser, Derek) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |