Fecteau v. The City of Mount Vernon et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-09173 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 42:1983dp Civil Right Denial of Due Process |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 15, 2024 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Ms. Charlene Humphreys
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Detective Montika Jones
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sergeant Mario Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Mount Vernon Department of Buildings
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of Mount Vernon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Mount Vernon Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew J. Fecteau
46 Gramatan Avenue Unit 1036
Mount Vernon, NY 10550 |
Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Matthew Fecteau consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Matthew J. Fecteau.(sc) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Matthew J. Fecteau. (sc) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. Document filed by Matthew Fecteau.(sc) |
|
misc
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants
Thu 10/19 2:49 PM
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re:7 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) |
||
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mt. Vernon Dept. of Buildings, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew J. Fecteau. (sc) |
|
6 | 6
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sgt. Mario Stewart, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew J. Fecteau. (sc) |
|
5 | 5
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of Mount Vernon, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew J. Fecteau. (sc) |
|
4 | 4
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Det. Montika Jones, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew J. Fecteau. (sc) |
|
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ms. Charlene Humphreys, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew J. Fecteau. (sc) Modified on 10/19/2023 (sc) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mt. Vernon Police Dept., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew J. Fecteau. (sc) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Charlene Humphreys, Montika Jones, Mario Stewart, The Mount Vernon Department of Buildings, The City of Mount Vernon, The Mount Vernon Police Department. Document filed by Matthew J. Fecteau. (sac) |
|
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 10/18 3:59 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sac) |
||
misc
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants
Thu 10/19 11:42 AM
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re:2 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) |
||
misc
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants
Thu 10/19 2:32 PM
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re:4 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) |
||
misc
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants
Thu 10/19 2:34 PM
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re:3 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) |
||
misc
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants
Thu 10/19 2:40 PM
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re:5 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) |
||
misc
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants
Thu 10/19 2:44 PM
Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re:6 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) |