Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00565
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2023 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Robert Hiley (1)
Represented By
David E. Johnson
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Cleveland
contact info
Jeffrey B. Lazarus
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Payum Doroodian
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info

GPO Dec 29 2023
Order as to Robert Hiley (1). Defendant has not met the criteria in 18 U.S.C. § 3143(a)(2). Defendant's 19 motion for bond is DENIED. The Court's prior directive on December 22, 2023 requiring the U.S. Pretrial Services and Probation Office to investigate the proposed address is RESCINDED AS MOOT. (Order [non-document] dated 12/22/2023). IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/29/2023. (S,SR)

Docket last updated: 10/21/2023 4:44 AM EDT
Monday, September 18, 2023
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/18/23 filed by USA as to Robert Hiley (1). (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
Case unsealed as to Robert Hiley (1). (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Robert Hiley (1) on 9/19/23. (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] as to Robert Hiley (1). Initial Appearance set for 9/19/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Initial Appearance before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg as to Robert Hiley (1) held on 9/19/23. AUSA Payum Doroodian present for the government. Federal Public Defender David Johnson present and appointed for the Defendant. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), to disclose evidence favorable to the defendant and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to comply with Brady and its progeny. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including dismissal of the indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Government moves for detention. Defendant requests a preliminary and detention hearing. Preliminary/Detention hearing scheduled for 9/22/23 at 10:00Am in courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (ECRO K. McGrew) (PTS: A. Torres) Time: 15 minutes. (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Order [non-document] Appointing Federal Public Defender David E. Johnson for Robert Hiley. The Federal Public Defender is reminded of counsel's obligation to report significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. CJA Plan, Part IV (D)(2). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/19/23. (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Robert Hiley (1). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/19/23. (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Order scheduling preliminary and detention hearing as to Robert Hiley (1). Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 9/22/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/19/23. (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
6 6 Notice of Appearance of Attorney - Jeffrey B. Lazarus appearing for Robert Hiley (1) replacing attorney David E. Johnson (Lazarus, Jeffrey) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 9/19/2023 in case as to Robert Hiley (1). (M,CE) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Preliminary/Detention before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg as to Robert Hiley (1) held on 9/22/23. AUSA Payum Doroodian present for the government. Attorney Jeffrey Lazarus present for the defendant. Waiver of preliminary hearing executed. Case is bound over to the Grand Jury for further proceedings. In the matter of detention proffers and argument were made. The matter of detention is taken under advisement. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (ECRO: P. Espinoza) (PTS: K. Cabanes) Time: 50 minutes (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Robert Hiley (1). (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
10 10 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Robert Hiley (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 9/28/23. (D,Ky) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
11 11 14-day request Non-Appeal Transcript Request by Robert Hiley (1) for proceedings held on 9/22/2023 before Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Court Reporter: ECRO. Requested completion date: 10/16/2023 (Lazarus, Jeffrey) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
12 12 Transcript of Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing Proceedings as to Robert Hiley (1) held on 9/22/23 before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Mary L. Uphold at (330) 884-7424 or mary_uphold@ohnd.uscourts.gov. [28 pages] Related Document11 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 10/19/2023. Redaction Request due 11/2/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2024. (U,ML) [1:23-mj-04228-JDG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (Mc,K)
Related: [-]
13 13 Indictment filed by USA as to Robert Hiley (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6. (Mc,K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page