Cameron v. Novo Nordisk Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-21374 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Kentucky Eastern, 3:23-cv-00066 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 9:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY & COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARKPCS HEALTH LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Cameron
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 08/12 12:09 PM
ORDER granting19 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Party. RUSSELL COLEMAN (ex rel ) added. Daniel Cameron (ex rel ) terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/9/2024. (jd, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Wed 07/17 8:24 AM
19 MOTION to Substitute Party REFERRED to Rukhsanah L. Singh. (lr, ) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Substitute Party
Tue 07/16 3:14 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Daniel Cameron. (ELLIS, TANYA) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/08 4:28 PM
NOTICE by Daniel Cameron of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (ELLIS, TANYA) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/06 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM LISTON, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LISTON, WILLIAM) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/06 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW C MCDONALD on behalf of All Plaintiffs (MCDONALD, MATTHEW) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/06 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM LAWRENCE DEAS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DEAS, WILLIAM) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER GARNER WATKINS, III on behalf of Daniel Cameron (WATKINS, WALTER) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/02 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TANYA DEARMAN ELLIS on behalf of Daniel Cameron (ELLIS, TANYA) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Mon 10/23 3:21 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (krg, ) |
|
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Mon 10/23 3:12 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 3:23-cv-00066. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Mon 10/23 2:38 PM
CERTIFIED ORDER received from USDC New Jersey re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 4 filed in MDL Case Number 3080.(CBD) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 10/23 3:18 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Mon 10/23 3:20 PM
Member Case Direct File on 10/23/2023, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg, ) |
||
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER : As required by 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned will recuse from further responsibility in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is REASSIGNED to Magistrate Matthew A. Stinnett.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins on 10/20/2023.(CBD)cc: COR | |
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: MDL No. 3080 (JJ) | |
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF FILING by ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC;, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC of Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action with the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation(Sweitzer, Stephanie) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Tag-Along Action filed with JPML | ||
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Cory Skolnick re3 Notice of Filing Removal; Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit A," "Exhibit B." Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JJ) | ||
Clerk's Note: re1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel notified by email with a copy of the notice of removal, amended state court complaint and docket sheet. (JJ) | ||
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC;, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC identifying Corporate Parent The Cigna Group for ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC;, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Sweitzer, Stephanie) | |
4 | 4 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Skolnick, Cory) | |
3 | 3 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL re1 COR by CAREMARK RX, LLC, CAREMARK, LLC, CAREMARKPCS HEALTH, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(Skolnick, Cory) Modified text on 10/18/2023 (CBD). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - State court Record Complaint | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-473. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 300000412), filed by EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS, LLC;, EXPRESS SCRIPTS PHARMACY, INC, ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC, MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.(MJY) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - TRICARE Contract, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Veteran Summary, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D -TRICARE Payment Matrix, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Conflict Check run. (MJY) | ||
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Cameron. Filed as part of the State Court Record at Supplemental COR 3 (CBD) |