Pinellas County, Florida v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
Lead case: 2:23-md-03080
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Rukhsanah L Singh |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-21381 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 8:23-cv-02153 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 20, 2024 9:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Express Scripts Inc.
1 Express Way
St. Louis, MO 63121 |
|
Defendant
UnitedHealth Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Optumrx Inc.
|
|
Defendant
OptumInsight Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Optum Inc.
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Defendant
MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.
|
|
Defendant
Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC.
|
|
Defendant
EVERNORTH HEALTH INC.
|
|
Defendant
ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
CVS PHARMACY INC.
|
|
Defendant
CVS HEALTH CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK RX L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC
|
|
Defendant
CAREMARK L.L.C.
|
|
In Re
INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION
|
|
Plaintiff
Pinellas County, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/31 6:21 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CAREMARK L.L.C., CAREMARK PCS HEALTH LLC, CAREMARK RX L.L.C., CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY INC., ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., EVERNORTH HEALTH INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS ADMINISTRATORS LLC., Express Scripts Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION, MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC., NOVO NORDISK INC., Optum Inc., OptumInsight Inc., Optumrx Inc., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group Inc, filed by Pinellas County, Florida.(TIMMONS, BECCA) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/01 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BECCA TIMMONS on behalf of Pinellas County, Florida (TIMMONS, BECCA) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
mdl
MDL Notice to Counsel
Mon 10/23 4:03 PM
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (krg, ) |
|
16 | 16
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Court Transfer
Mon 10/23 3:54 PM
Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:23-cv-02153. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
15 | 15
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Mon 10/23 2:49 PM
MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: District of New Jersey MDL case number: 3080.. (JNB) |
|
Att: 1 Letter from District of New Jersey | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 10/23 4:00 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (krg, ) |
||
mdl
MDL Direct File
Mon 10/23 4:01 PM
Member Case Direct File on 10/23/2023, for MDL 3080 INSULIN PRICING LITIGATION. (krg, ) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc. (Widlanski, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/4/2023 (GL). | |
13 | 13 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc. (Widlanski, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/4/2023 (GL). | |
12 | 12 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Widlanski, Benjamin) | |
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
11 | 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC. (Widlanski, Benjamin) | |
10 | 10 SEALED DOCUMENT Unredacted COMPLAINT re 8 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Pinellas County, Florida (Widlanski, Benjamin). Modified text on 10/2/2023 (BD). | |
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, as to Novo Nordisk Inc. (Widlanski, Benjamin) Modified text on 10/2/2023 (LSS). | |
8 | 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion for leave to file under seal. Plaintiff's Corrected Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Doc. 6) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of Court an unredacted version of its complaint under seal within 5 days of this Order. The unredacted complaint shall remain under seal until further order of this Court. The Clerk is directed to strike the original Motion for leave to file Unredacted Complaint under seal (Doc. 2) and this Court's order on that original Motion (Doc. 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/29/2023. (SC) | |
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/28/2023 by Pinellas County, Florida as to Eli Lilly and Company. (Widlanski, Benjamin) | |
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 Plaintiff's CORRECTED MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT to file an Unredacted version of its Complaint under seal by Pinellas County, Florida (Widlanski, Benjamin). | |
5 | 5 STRICKEN per Endorsed Order 8. ENDORSED ORDER granting 2 Motion for leave to file under seal. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Doc. 2) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file with the Clerk of Court an unredacted version of its complaint under seal within 5 days of this Order. The unredacted complaint shall remain under seal until further order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/26/2023. (SC) Modified text on 10/2/2023 (BD). | |
4 | 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Roland Tellis, Rachel Sullivan, Christopher A. Seegar, Burton LeBlanc, IV, Steven J. Doroci, Russell W. Budd, and David Buchanan of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR) | |
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:23-cv-2153-JSM-AEP. Motion(s) REFERRED:2 Plaintiff's MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT Unredacted COMPLAINT under seal. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (ARC) | |
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 STRICKEN per Endorsed Order 8. MOTION for leave to file Unredacted COMPLAINT under seal by Pinellas County, Florida(Widlanski, Benjamin). (Modified on 9/26/2023 to edit docket text) (JDR). Modified text on 10/2/2023 (BD). | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1 217 pgs COMPLAINT against CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark RX, LLC, Caremark, LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Evernorth Health, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Medco Health Solutions, Inc., Novo Nordisk Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumInsight, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21283561) filed by Pinellas County, Florida.(Widlanski, Benjamin) (Modified on 9/26/2023 to edit docket text)(JDR). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |