Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 0:23-cv-62046
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Terminated:Aug 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Willie Edward Hogue
Defendant
Kimberly Sue Loszewski
Defendant
The Savvy Group, LLC.
Plaintiff
David William Starr
Represented By
Elliot Ari Kozolchyk
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
22 22 misc Status Report Wed 02/05 7:55 PM
STATUS REPORT by David William Starr (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
21 21 order Judgment - Default Tue 08/13 4:15 PM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of David William Starr against The Savvy Group, LLC. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 08/13 4:10 PM
ORDER Granting18 Motion for Default Judgment. Default Final Judgment will be entered by separate order. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 08/05 10:27 PM
STATUS REPORT by David William Starr (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
18 18 motion Default Judgment Tue 07/30 6:07 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment by David William Starr.(Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Plaintiff David William Starr
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
17 17 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/16 9:46 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time. Plaintiff shall move for default judgment against Defendant THE SAVVY GROUP, LLC. D/B/A SAVVY MARKETING GROUP no later than July 31, 2024. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/16/2024. (kv00)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
16 16 motion Extension of Time Mon 07/15 9:40 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Default Final Judgment re 15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,13 Order by David William Starr. Responses due by 7/29/2024. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 06/25 9:47 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting14 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall move for default judgment in accordance with the procedures set forth in13 Order on Default Final Judgment Procedure by July 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/15/2024. (kv00)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Mon 06/24 10:20 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to file Default Judgment against The Savvy Group, LLC. re13 Order by David William Starr. Responses due by 7/8/2024. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
13 13 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 06/04 7:53 AM
ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/4/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
12 12 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Tue 05/14 8:27 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to The Savvy Group, LLC - Motions Terminated:11 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 5/14/2024. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
11 11 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 05/13 3:57 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to All Defendants by David William Starr. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
10 10 order Administrative Order Tue 05/07 10:47 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER regarding8 Summons Returned Executed. Plaintiff shall move for entry of Clerk's default as to Defendant The Savvy Group, LLC by May 13, 2024 . Failure to do so may lead to dismissal, without further notice, of Plaintiff's claims against this Defendant for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/7/2024. (lfa)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Status Report Order Tue 05/07 10:28 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE as to Defendants Loszewski and Hogue ONLY (Status Report due by 8/5/2024). Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 5/7/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
8 8 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 05/06 2:56 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David William Starr. The Savvy Group, LLC. served on 10/30/2023, response/answer due 11/20/2023. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 05/06 2:54 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David William Starr. Kimberly Sue Loszewski served on 10/30/2023, response/answer due 11/20/2023. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 05/06 2:52 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David William Starr. Willie Edward Hogue served on 10/27/2023, response/answer due 11/17/2023. (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Mon 05/06 2:51 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to Defendants Kimberly Sue Loszewski and Willie Edward Hogue by David William Starr (Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 05/01 8:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 5/6/2024. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/30/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/26 8:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Willie Edward Hogue, Kimberly Sue Loszewski, The Savvy Group, LLC. (rbe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 10/26 7:58 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/25 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17022776, filed by David William Starr.(Kozolchyk, Elliot)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Statement of Claim