Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:23-bk-02871
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2023
Plan Confirmed:May 01, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Premier Kings, Inc.
7078 Peachtree Industrial Blvd Ste 800
Peachtree Corners, GA 30071-1068
Represented By
Jesse S Vogtle, Jr
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
918 918 court Final Hearing Set Mon 04/14 1:33 PM
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Michael Harrison Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 4/28/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (cmh)
Related: [-] 916 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor Andre Manuel
917 917 misc Fact Summary for Motion for Relief from Stay Mon 04/14 8:55 AM
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Andre Manuel Related [+]. (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-] 916 Motion for Relief from Stay , Fee Amount $199,
916 916 motion Relief from Stay Mon 04/14 8:54 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay , Fee Amount $199, Filed by Creditor Andre Manuel (Harrison, Michael)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 04/14 8:56 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay([LINK 23-02871 TOM11] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A30521126. Fee Amount 199.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#916
Friday, April 11, 2025
915 915 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 04/11 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 04/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 914 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
914 914 court Notice of Hearing - Van002 Wed 04/09 2:44 PM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 4/28/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. (cmh)
Related: [-] 906 Motion for Examination filed by Interested Party Mark Smith