Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. et al v. Giddens
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-08825 |
Nature of Suit | 423 Bankruptcy - Withdrawal 28 USC 157 |
Cause | 28:157 Motion to Withdraw Reference |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2016 |
Debtor
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
, |
|
Debtor
Lehman Brothers Inc.
, |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 2:44 PM EDT |
Defendant
James W. Giddens
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Letter
Wed 09/06 3:54 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard J. J. Scarola dated September 6, 2017 re: in Response to letter from James C. Fitzpatrick dated 8/31/2017. Document filed by 344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459.(Scarola, Richard) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Letter
Thu 08/31 5:19 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from James C. Fitzpatrick dated 08/31/2017 re: Relatedness. Document filed by James W. Giddens.(Fitzpatrick, James) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Thu 12/15 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 12/1/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Transcript
Thu 12/15 3:34 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 12/1/2016 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 12/05 1:11 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Order dated December 1, 2016, Claimants' motion to withdraw the reference of the adversary proceeding is denied, and Claimants' motion to stay the adversary proceeding is denied as moot; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 12/5/2016)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal, | ||
Att: 2 Right to Appeal | ||
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Mon 12/05 1:13 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km) |
||
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference
Thu 12/01 3:14 PM
ORDER. For the reasons set forth on the record at the December 1 conference, Claimants' motion to withdraw the reference of the adversary proceeding is DENIED, and Claimants' motion to stay the adversary proceeding is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 1, and to close the case. It is SO ORDERED. Denying1 Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/1/2016) (rjm) |
|
minutes
Pre-Motion Conference
Thu 12/01 12:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 12/1/2016. Plaintiffs' counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs' motion to withdraw the reference is DENIED, an Plaintiffs' motion to stay the adversary proceeding is DENIED as moot. (Court Reporter Mike McDaniel) (jar) |
||
misc
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
Thu 12/01 3:16 PM
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re:26 Order on Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (rjm) |
||
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 11/29 6:29 PM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The pre-motion conference previously scheduled for 10:00 AM on Dec. 1, 2016, is rescheduled for 9:30 AM on December 1, 2015. (Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 09:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.)(jar) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Wed 11/23 1:07 PM
ORDER. On November 15, 2016, this Court scheduled a pre-motion conferencefor December 1, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the proposed motion to stay. Doc. 22. The parties are hereby notified that oral argument on Claimants' motion to withdraw the reference shall also be heard at the December 1, 2016 conference. The parties should be prepared to discuss whether resolution of their dispute requires substantial and material consideration of non-bankruptcy federal law. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/23/2016) (rjm) |
|
Tuesday, November 22, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Tue 11/22 5:40 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from James C. Fitzpatrick dated 11/22/2016 re: Response to the November 11, 2016 letter (ECF No. 21) requesting permission to move to stay further proceedings in the Bankruptcy Court until this Court decides the Claimants motion to withdraw the reference. Document filed by James W. Giddens.(Fitzpatrick, James) |
|
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Conference
Tue 11/15 5:48 PM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion for Conference. The request for a pre-motion conference is GRANTED. A conference will be held on Dec. 1, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. The Trustee is directed to submit a written response by Nov. 22, 2016. Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/15/2016) (kgo) |
|
Friday, November 11, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Conference
Fri 11/11 12:34 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard J. J. Scarola dated November 11, 2016. Document filed by 344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459.(Scarola, Richard) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2016 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Thu 07/28 1:47 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard J.J. Scarola dated 07/28/2016 re: Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Document filed by 344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459.(Scarola, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Transcript | ||
Friday, January 08, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Fri 01/08 4:43 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard J.J. Scarola dated January 8, 2016 re: letter to the Court from the Trustee's counsel dated January 6, 2016. Document filed by 344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459.(Scarola, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Wed 01/06 1:09 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from James C. Fitzpatrick dated 1/6/2016 re: Related matters. Document filed by James W. Giddens.(Fitzpatrick, James) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Thu 08/13 5:17 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 07/29/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Transcript
Thu 08/13 5:11 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 7/29/2015 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015.(Grant, Patricia) |
|
Monday, June 29, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 06/30 11:25 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (14 in 1:14-cv-08825-ER) Letter filed by 344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459. ENDORSEMENT: The status conference in this matter, and in 14-cv-7643, is adjourned to July 29, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 7/29/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/29/2015) (ama) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Mon 06/29 12:36 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Richard J.J. Scarola dated June 29, 2015 Document filed by 344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459.(Scarola, Richard) |
|
Friday, June 26, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 06/26 2:37 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (12 in 1:14-cv-08825-ER) (17 in 1:14-cv-07643) Letter request for conference, filed by James W. Giddens. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. A status conference will be held on Friday, July 17, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. (Status Conference set for 7/17/2015 at 11:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/26/2015) (tro) |
|
Thursday, June 25, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Thu 06/25 5:59 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from James C. Fitzpatrick dated June 25, 2015 re: Request for Status Conference. Document filed by James W. Giddens.(Fitzpatrick, James) |
|
Friday, December 19, 2014 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 12/19 4:00 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 08-1420A (SCC), 08-B-13555 (SCC). . Document filed by 344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459. (Scarola, Richard) |
|
Thursday, December 04, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/04 11:20 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Benedict Kobak, Jr on behalf of James W. Giddens. (Kobak, James) |
|
Tuesday, December 02, 2014 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/02 6:55 PM
DECLARATION of Karen M. Chau in Opposition re:1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 08-1420A (SCC), 08-B-13555 (SCC).. Document filed by James W. Giddens. (Fitzpatrick, James) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/02 6:54 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 08-1420A (SCC), 08-B-13555 (SCC). . Document filed by James W. Giddens. (Fitzpatrick, James) |
|
Tuesday, November 18, 2014 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order
Tue 11/18 5:55 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the parties hereto, as follows: The respondent's time to serve any papers in opposition to movants' Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Reference herein shall be December 2, 2014. The movants' time to serve any reply papers in further support or that motion shall be December 19, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/18/2014) (ama) |
|
Monday, November 10, 2014 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/10 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Margaret Chau on behalf of James W. Giddens. (Chau, Karen) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/10 4:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meaghan Christina Gragg on behalf of James W. Giddens. (Gragg, Meaghan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/10 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Steven Margolin on behalf of James W. Giddens. (Margolin, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 11/10 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Charles Fitzpatrick on behalf of James W. Giddens. (Fitzpatrick, James) |
|
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Mon 11/10 9:59 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-cv-07643-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Mon 11/10 9:59 AM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 11/10 9:59 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (pgu) |
||
misc
Mail Letter of Notification to Bankruptcy Court
Mon 11/10 3:42 PM
Mailed letter to the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York as notification of filing of Bankruptcy Motion to Withdraw Reference (Case Number: 08-01420 SCC)(SIPA).) with the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y. and the assignment of S.D.N.Y. Case Number: 14-cv-8825. (pgu) |
||
misc
Mail Notice to Attorney(s)
Mon 11/10 3:43 PM
Mailed notice re:2 Civil Cover Sheet,1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 08-1420A (SCC), 08-B-13555 (SCC). to the attorney(s) of record. (pgu) |
||
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 11/06 1:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference
Thu 11/06 12:28 PM
MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 08-1420A (SCC), 08-B-13555 (SCC).Document filed by 344 Individuals Identified in the Notices of Appearances at Bankr. ECF Dkt. Nos. 8234, 8905 & 9459.(bkar) |
|
utility
Bankruptcy Withdrawal Referred as Possibly Related/Similar - Atty
Thu 11/06 1:28 PM
BANKRUPTCY WITHDRAWAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 14-cv-7643. (bkar) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 11/06 2:07 PM
Case Designated ECF. (bkar) |