Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:23-bk-14415
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Nov 27, 2023

Debtor
Von Sydow's Moving and Storage, Inc.
2170 Azure Lane
Algonquin, IL 60102
Represented By
Joe C Pioletti
Pioletti Pioletti & Nichols
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Frank J Kokoszka
Kokoszka & Janczur, P.C. 19 South LaSalle Suite 1201
Chicago, IL 60603
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 10/27/2023 5:12 PM CDT
Friday, October 27, 2023
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a) Fri 10/27 10:22 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by Joe C Pioletti on behalf of Von Sydow's Moving and Storage, Inc. (Pioletti, Joe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Signature Pages
2 2 misc Certificate of Credit Counseling Fri 10/27 10:24 AM
Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Joe C Pioletti on behalf of Von Sydow's Moving and Storage, Inc.. (Pioletti, Joe)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation) Fri 10/27 11:11 AM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 11/27/2023 at 11:30 AM at Zoom - Kokoszka: Meeting ID 682 668 2897, Passcode 9254024265, Phone 1-872-201-1823. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
4 4 crditcrd none Fri 10/27 12:58 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 23-14415 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A47099182. Fee Amount $ 338.00 (Pioletti, Joe) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1