Rolling Meadows Water Company v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05346 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2023 |
Case in other court: | New York Northern, 1:23-cv-01187 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
individualy and as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
individually and as successor in interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
individually and as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Rolling Meadows Water Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/08 4:37 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by The 3M Company, 3M Company, The, 3M Company, The 3M Company, The 3M Company, 3M Company, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co). List of cases for dismissal)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, October 30, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/30 2:49 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 10/27 4:10 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-01187. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #154. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Product Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard M. Gergel, U.S. District Judge. (amt) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/27/2023.] | |
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ORDER: (1) the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 10/25/2023 before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric and the filing of the Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures, are all STAYED without date, (2) the deadline for Defendants Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, L.P., to respond to the complaint is STAYED, and (3) no later than 11/30/2023, the parties are directed to file detailed status reports. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/19/2023. (jdc ) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/27/2023.] | |
Monday, September 18, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/25/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/18/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/27/2023.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Andrew Croner, Email address is acroner@napolilaw.com. Phone number is 212-397-1000. Admissions due by 10/2/2023. (khr) (Copy emailed to attorney on 9/18/2023) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/27/2023.] | |
2 | 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in NYS Supreme Court - County of Ulster. (khr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/27/2023.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Ulster, case number EF2023-1412 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6447707) filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP, Chemguard Inc.(khr) [Transferred from New York Northern on 10/27/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service |