Beeman et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05350 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Nevada, 2:23-cv-01596 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 22, 2024 4:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Steamatic of Southern Nevada
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Marken Enterprises
|
|
Defendant
Logistical Solutions, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl J. Beeman, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karl J. Beeman, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benita Beeman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 5:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benita Beeman, Karl J. Beeman, Sr, Karl J. Beeman, Jr Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-05350-RMG(Scotti, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/09 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benita Beeman, Karl J. Beeman, Sr, Karl J. Beeman, Jr Logistical Solutions, LLC (Scotti, Richard) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/09 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Benita Beeman, Karl J. Beeman, Sr, Karl J. Beeman, Jr of Logistical Solutions (Scotti, Richard) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice Other
Fri 10/27 4:27 PM
NOTICE TO NEW COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) is open as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. All counsel of record are directed to take the steps necessary to be registered as electronic filers in the District of South Carolina ( See CMO No. 3 pg. 17 Electronic Filing at 22. footnote 5 (ECF Multidistrict Litigation Attorney Registration Form - available at link at the end of this NOTICE). CMO Nos. 1 - 27, (including any supplemental CMO Nos. i.e., 2.A, etc.) govern all cases in the MDL proceedings and can be viewed in the Lead case. Counsel will be notified by Liaison Counsel re new Case Management Orders and other new documents posted in the lead case. Please also read CLERKS NOTICE (s) TO ALL COUNSEL ASSOCIATED WITH MDL 2873 and QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE (s) filed in the Lead case. NOTICE of Hearing: Next Monthly Status Conference will be via a Telephone Conference set for 10/31/2023 10:00 AM, before Honorable Richard M Gergel (call-in instructions will be circulated prior to each telephonic status conference). See the District Court's website containing information on the MDL at[LINK:MDL-2873] (sshe, ) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
|
11 | 11
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 10/27 4:24 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Nevada (associated as of 10/25/2023), 2:23-cv-01596, Beeman et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05350-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 10/27 4:20 PM
Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:23-cv-01596. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
9 | 9 Certified MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-154) transferring case to the District of South Carolina. Signed by MDL on 10/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
8 | 8 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-154) transferring case to the District of South Carolina. Signed by MDL on 10/23/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
Att: 1 MDL Minute Order | ||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
7 | 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant 3M Company.. (Fears, Chad) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by 3M Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Fears, Chad) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
5 | 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by 3M Company, Karl J. Beeman, Sr., Benita Beeman, Karl J. Beeman, Jr. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/23/2023. (no image attached) (CJS) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER Granting3 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading deadlines for all Defendants due on the 28th day after the JPML has issued a final order determining whether to transfer this action to the AFFF MDL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant 3M Company. (Fears, Chad) (extend) (answer) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 10/6/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/21/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/5/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC) [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-23-871098-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7451020) by 3M Company. Proof of service due by 8/20/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/15/2023. (Fears, Chad) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from Nevada on 10/27/2023.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |