Mullings v. Finley
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-09603 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241fd Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 12/05 5:27 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:14 Letter filed by Kyle T. Mullings. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Court thanks petitioner's counsel for this welcome update. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/05/2023) (ama) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Tue 12/05 3:26 PM
THIRD LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Paul Felicione dated 12/5/23 re: Court Order Dated 12/04/2023. Document filed by Kyle T. Mullings..(Felicione, Paul) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Mon 12/04 3:48 PM
ORDER On November 21, 2023, the Court issued an order to show cause, requiring the parties' counsel to confer regarding settlement, and setting a briefing schedule on Mullings' s petition in the event that counsel could not come to an agreement. Dkt. 10. Under that schedule, Finley was to file a response to Mullings's petition by December 1, 2023. No such response has been received, nor has Finley entered an appearance in this matter. The Court orders Mullings's counsel, by December 6, 2023, to file a status update on the docket of this case. That status update must describe whether he has conferred with Finley's counsel (that is, the government) regarding issuance of the writ; whether the government opposes the relief sought; and whether Mullings continues to seek issuance of the writ. The Court notes that discussions with prison counsellors ( or other employees) will be deemed insufficient for this purpose; such discussions must have occurred with legal counsel. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/4/2023) (jca) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Tue 11/07 3:54 PM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/21/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. This conference will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound(#) key. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/7/2023) (ks) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Letter
Mon 11/06 12:12 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Paul Felicione dated 11/06/2023 re: Court Order Dated 11/03/2023. Document filed by Kyle T. Mullings..(Felicione, Paul) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 11/03 3:59 PM
ORDER: The Court, however, acknowledges that earlier precedent is not pellucid on this point. In particular, in Carbo v. United States, 364 U.S. 611 (1961), the Court held that the writ of habeas corpus ad prosequendum ("prosecutorial writ") may issue extraterritorially, but left open the question as to the writ at issue here-the writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum ("testimonial writ"). For the avoidance of doubt, however, the Court sua sponte proposes to transfer this case to the Middle District of Pennsylvania, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a), as courts routinely do when presented with Section 2241 petitions filed in an improper venue. See Shehnaz v. Ashcroft, No. 04 Civ. 2578 (DLC), 2004 WL 2378371, at *4 (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 25, 2004) (collecting cases). Given the rapidly approaching deadline for Mullings's scheduled deposition, the Court orders Mullings to file, by November 7, 2023, a letter on the docket of this case responding to the Court's proposal to transfer his petition. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/3/2023) (ks) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 11/02 12:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Felicione, Paul) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 11/02 11:52 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul J. Felicione to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Plaintiff party name does not match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 11/02 11:52 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul J. Felicione. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 11/02 11:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul J. Felicione. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kyle Mullings; Scott Finley. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 11/02 11:55 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 11/02 11:56 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 11/02 11:57 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 11/01 1:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Felicione, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Wed 11/01 12:46 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28508079)Document filed by Kyle Mullings..(Felicione, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint |